Sudberry v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Insititution
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Referred: | Karen L Litkovitz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Petitioner
James D. Sudberry r
|
|
Petitioner
James Sudberry r
|
|
Respondent
Warden, Lebanon Correctional Insititution
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 09/06 11:34 AM
ORDER of USCA: The Sixth Circuit DENIES Sudberry's motion for authorization to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. §2254 petition. (er) |
|
Sunday, April 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Docket Annotation
Sun 04/02 4:18 PM
USCA Case Number - 17-3266 The Movant's application under 28 U.S.C. § 2244 for permission to file a second or successive habeas petition has been docketed as case number 17-3266 The case number must appear on all filings. (pb) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 03/17 4:36 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: ORDER (Doc.6 ) (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 03/17 4:33 PM
ORDER adopting5 Report and Recommendations. The Petition (Doc.4 ) is TRANSFERRED to the Sixth Circuit for further proceedings consistent with the Recommendation by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/17/2017. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/28 11:10 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that because this Court lacks jurisdiction in this mater involving a successive habeas petition within the meaning of 28:2244(b), petitioner's re4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Transferred to the Sixth (6th) Circuit for further proceedings as required under 28:2244(b)(3). Objections to R&R due by 3/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/28/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 02/16 4:05 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Sudberry, r. (eh) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 02/16 4:04 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Petitioner James Sudberry, r. (eh) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 01/25 10:33 AM
ORDER granting1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and authorizing commencement of this action without prepayment of fees or costs. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that petitioner must sign his petition for habeas corpus relief and return it to the Clerk of Court within (30) days of filing of this Order. The Clerk of Court is Directed to provide the petitioner with a copy of the petition so that it can be signed and returned to the Court within the requisite (30) day period. Petitioner is further Ordered to show cause in writing within (30) days of the date of filing of this Order, why this action should not be transferred to the 6th Circuit Court of Appeals as a successive petition. Petitioner's Show Cause Response due by 2/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/25/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified docket text on 1/25/2017 (eh) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 01/25 10:35 AM
Copy of petitioner's petition for habeas corpus relief issued this date to petitioner pursuant to the Court's Order2 . (art) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/18 9:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner James Sudberry, r. (eh) |
|
Att: 1 Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Extraordinary Writ of Habeas Corpus/Petition for Couselor (Attorney) |