Mathew v. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00237 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Broadcom Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Broadcom Limited
|
|
Defendant
Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Judy Bruner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lloyd A. Carney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Renato A. Dipentima
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alan L. Earhart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John W. Gerdelman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kim C. Goodman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David L. House
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
L. William Krause
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David E. Roberson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanjay Vaswani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby M. Mathew
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Case Management Conference - Further
Thu 01/18 2:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/18/2018. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to close this consolidated case and all related cases in 30 days from the date of this order unless further motions are filed by parties. FTR Time: 10:40-11:03. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2018) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 01/16 4:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference remains set for 1/18/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Judge Chen ordered Lead counsel and Plaintiffs counsel in all related cases to attend at that time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Transcript
Mon 08/28 3:57 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/3/17, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2017. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Fri 04/14 12:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel - Docket No. 38 in case 3:16-cv-07081-EMC.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 04/14 9:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 4/13/2017 re MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Giulio D. Cessario. Granted. All future filings shall be filed under C16-7081 EMC Further CMC set for 9/14/17 at 10:30 a.m. Total Time in Court 5 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2017) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Mon 04/17 9:51 AM
Create association: Case consolidated with 3:16-cv-07081-EMC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/13 5:11 PM
NOTICE by Bobby M. Mathew Certificate of Service (Wissbroecker, David) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/02 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Scott Holleman (Holleman, William) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Tue 02/28 1:59 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 17 Administrative Motion for Relief from Automatic Referral to ADR Program. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
18 | 18
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 02/28 1:54 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 3/16/2017 to 4/13/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 02/22 12:39 PM
Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relief from Automatic Referral to ADR Program filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney, Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, John W. Gerdelman, Kim C. Goodman, David L. House, L. William Krause, David E. Roberson, Sanjay Vaswani. Responses due by 2/27/2017.(Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Tue 02/21 12:17 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 02/21 12:01 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., David E. Roberson, David L. House, Kim C. Goodman, Sanjay Vaswani, John W. Gerdelman, L. William Krause, Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 02/16 2:17 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney, Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, John W. Gerdelman, Kim C. Goodman, David L. House, L. William Krause, David E. Roberson, Sanjay Vaswani. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
13 | 13
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 02/16 10:54 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Relating Case
Wed 02/15 11:42 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE (C16-7081 EMC). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/03 12:25 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Gideon A. Schor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 02/02 2:22 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney, Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, John W. Gerdelman, Kim C. Goodman, David L. House, L. William Krause, David E. Roberson, Sanjay Vaswani identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Other Affiliate XL Catlin, Other Affiliate Beazley Group, Other Affiliate AXIS Capital, Other Affiliate Hiscox Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company for Alan L. Earhart, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., David E. Roberson, David L. House, John W. Gerdelman, Judy Bruner, Kim C. Goodman, L. William Krause, Lloyd A. Carney, Renato A. Dipentima, Sanjay Vaswani. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/02 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin (Benjamin, Aaron) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/02 2:01 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gideon A. Schor ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 260F5BQD.) Filing fee previously paid on 2-2-17 filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney, Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, John W. Gerdelman, Kim C. Goodman, David L. House, L. William Krause, David E. Roberson, Sanjay Vaswani.(Schor, Gideon) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/02 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Feldman (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/24 12:25 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/24 12:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney, Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, John W. Gerdelman, Kim C. Goodman, David L. House, L. William Krause, David E. Roberson, Sanjay Vaswani. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/19 10:52 AM
Case assigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 01/18 9:59 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bobby M. Mathew (Wissbroecker, David) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/18 9:57 AM
Proposed Summons. (Wissbroecker, David) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 9:52 AM
COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws against Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Limited, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney, Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, John W. Gerdelman, Kim C. Goodman, David L. House, L. William Krause, David E. Roberson, Sanjay Vaswani ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11081478.). Filed byBobby M. Mathew.(Wissbroecker, David) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |