South Carolina District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcdonald
Referred: Kevin Mcdonald
Case #: 2:17-cv-00158
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2017
Terminated:Jan 29, 2018
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Clarendon School District One
Represented By
Alice Price Adams
Murphy And Grantland
contact info
Jeffrey C Kull
Murphy And Grantland
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosa Dingle
Represented By
Bryn Colette Sarvis
Sarvis Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 29, 2018
31 31 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/29 10:41 AM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Clarendon School District One and Rosa Dingle. (Kull, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/29/2018 to edit filers and text (kric, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
29 29 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Consent Wed 09/13 3:48 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/13/2017. (kric, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
28 28 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/01 6:44 PM
ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint by Clarendon School District One.(Kull, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/18 3:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rosa Dingle, filed by Rosa Dingle. Service due by 10/16/2017 (Sarvis, Bryn)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 07/18 2:16 PM
TEXT ORDER granting the plaintiff's 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend through 7/20/17 without objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/18/17.(ctuc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 07/17 8:42 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Rosa Dingle. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Sarvis, Bryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Unpublished Opinions
Monday, July 10, 2017
24 24 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 07/10 2:53 PM
TEXT ORDER granting the plaintiff's 21 Motion to Amend with no objection from the defendant (doc. 22). The plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint by July 14, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/10/17.(ctuc, )
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response to Motion Do not use if support or object to motion Mon 07/10 12:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint Response filed by Clarendon School District One.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/17/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Kull, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
21 21 motion Amend/Correct Mon 06/26 6:05 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Rosa Dingle. Response to Motion due by 7/10/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Sarvis, Bryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Supporting Documents proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Supporting Documents EEOC Charge,
Att: 4 Supporting Documents Notice of Right to Sue
Friday, June 09, 2017
20 20 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 06/09 4:28 PM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Rosa Dingle.(Sarvis, Bryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
18 18 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 06/08 5:06 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Clarendon School District One.(Kull, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
17 17 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/02 2:57 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/29/17, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 10/31/17, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/30/17, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/30/17, Discovery due by 1/30/18, Motions due by 3/29/18, Mediation Due by 12/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/2/17. (ctuc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
15 15 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 06/01 4:05 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Clarendon School District One.. (Kull, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 06/01 4:00 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Clarendon School District One.(Kull, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/04 4:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/25/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/8/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 6/8/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/29/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/31/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/30/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/30/2017, Discovery due by 10/30/2017, ADR Statement due by 10/30/2017, Mediation Due by 11/29/2017, Motions due by 12/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 5/4/17. (kmca)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
12 12 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/21 9:06 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Clarendon School District One. Refiled by clerk after removing as an attachment to answer.(kric, )
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/20 4:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Clarendon School District One.(Kull, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/20 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Price Adams on behalf of Clarendon School District One (Adams, Alice)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/24 11:02 AM
TEXT ORDER granting the defendant's 7 Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise plead through 3/20/17 with consent of the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/24/17.(cnob, )
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/24 10:15 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Clarendon School District One. Response to Motion due by 3/10/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.. Filed by clerk at the direction of chambers.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter to Sarvis
6 6 misc Letter Extending Time to Answer Fri 02/24 9:22 AM
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Clarendon School District One answer due 3/20/2017.(Kull, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Sarvis
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Wed 02/15 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa Dingle. Clarendon School District One served on 2/8/2017, answer due 3/1/2017.(Sarvis, Bryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons CCSO Affidavit of Service
Thursday, January 19, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/19 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Clarendon School District One. (kric, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 01/19 10:01 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rosa Dingle.(kric, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/19 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Clarendon School District One ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-6950575.), filed by Rosa Dingle. Service due by 4/18/2017(kric, )
Related: [-]