Wesco IV, LLC v. Wilson et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00241 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Emmanuel Goins
22713 Spire Street
Hayward, CA 94541 |
|
Defendant
Aja Harrison
22713 Spire Street
Hayward, CA 94541 |
|
Defendant
Stafunda Wilson
22713 Spire Street
Hayward, CA 94541 |
|
Plaintiff
Wesco IV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 03/08 9:49 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/07 1:54 PM
ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The case is ordered remanded to the Superior Court of Alameda County. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/7/2017.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Objection
Tue 02/07 5:59 PM
OBJECTION to7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Emmanuel Goins. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Objection
Tue 02/07 5:53 PM
OBJECTION to7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Aja Harrison. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/25 2:19 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/25/17.(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 01/25 11:11 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/25/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/25 10:59 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding sua sponte remand to state court. Objections due within fourteen days of service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 25, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) (klhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (1/25/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/25 10:56 AM
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 3 , 4 Applications for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) (klhS, COURT STAFF). (klhS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2017 (klhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 2 (1/25/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/19 5:35 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wesco IV, LLC.. (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/19 5:12 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Emmanuel Goins. (tnS) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/19 5:11 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Aja Harrison. (tnS) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
2 | 2
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/19 5:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (tnS) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/19 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL & Jury Trial Demanded (no process) from Superior Court for the San Leandro-Hayward Judicial District - Limited Civil Jurisdiction, County of Alameda. Their case number is HG16838957, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered on 1/18/2017). Filed by Defendants Aja Harrison & Emmanuel Goins. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2017. (tnS) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |