Bull et al v. Audi AG et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00268 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 2:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Audi AG
|
|
Defendant
Audi of America LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lee Bull
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Gutzler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Sheller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dae Sob Yoon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 04/24 3:28 PM
ORDER Re Status Report, modifying the due date for new case status reports set forth in previous orders 3142 3173 . (crblc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 04/07 8:30 AM
ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT. Reports shall be filed by Thursday, April 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/7/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/19 2:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:16-cv-03885. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-80), transferring case to the Northern District of California per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. (AKL) | |
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark A. DiCello for Lee Bull, Robin Gutzler, Jamie Sheller, and Dae Sob Yoon. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/14/16. (MAM) | |
5 | 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. DiCello. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5241843 by Lee Bull, Robin Gutzler, Jamie Sheller, Dae Sob Yoon. (Bleichner, Bryan) | |
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing W. Daniel Dee Miles, III; H. Clay Barnett, III; Archie I. Grubb, II; Adam J. Levitt; Daniel R. Ferri; Jeff A. Almeida; Kyle McGee; Mark DiCello; Thomas L. Young as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Audi AG, Audi of America, LLC. (lmb) | |
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 16-cv-3885 (JNE/TNL). (lmb) | |
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Audi AG, Audi of America, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5193960.) Filed by Robin Gutzler, Lee Bull, Jamie Sheller, Dae Sob Yoon. Filer requests summons issued. (Bleichner, Bryan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |