Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda Moody Whinery
Case #: 2:17-bk-00594
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2017
Terminated:Aug 07, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Sep 14, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
GREEN FUEL TECHNOLOGIES
3423 S 51st Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85043-6211
Represented By
PERNELL W. MCGUIRE
Davis Miles Mcguire Gardner, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
275 275 order oFinal Decree (Closes Case) Wed 08/07 5:07 PM
Final Decree (Case Closed) signed on 8/7/2019 Related [+] . (Henderson, Katie)
Related: [-] 263 Motion for Final Decree
274 274 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 08/07 1:17 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by M. PRESTON GARDNER of DAVIS MILES MCGUIRE GARDNER PLLC on behalf of GREEN FUEL TECHNOLOGIES Related [+].(GARDNER, M.)
Related: [-] 263 Motion for Final Decree
273 273 other Certificate of Service and No Objections Wed 08/07 11:54 AM
Certificate of Service and No Objections TO AMENDED APPLICATION FOR FINAL DECREE filed by M. PRESTON GARDNER of DAVIS MILES MCGUIRE GARDNER PLLC on behalf of GREEN FUEL TECHNOLOGIES. Related [+] (GARDNER, M.)
Related: [-] 263 Motion for Final Decree,264 Notice of Bar Date,272 Certificate of Mailing
272 272 other Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/07 11:46 AM
Certificate of Mailing filed by M. PRESTON GARDNER of DAVIS MILES MCGUIRE GARDNER PLLC on behalf of GREEN FUEL TECHNOLOGIES. Related [+] (GARDNER, M.)
Related: [-] 263 Motion for Final Decree,264 Notice of Bar Date