Multi Media, LLC v. chaturbate.to
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00301 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 2:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
chaturbate.to
|
|
Plaintiff
Multi Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/12 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Multi Media, LLC (Green, Ronald) (Filed on 2/12/2018) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 11/08 12:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 20 Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2018. Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 11/06 5:48 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference re19 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Multi Media, LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2017.(Green, Ronald) (Filed on 11/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Ronald D. Green, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/04 9:54 AM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Fri 07/28 1:14 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 14 Motion for Service by Publication. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/31 8:06 AM
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 14 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Multi Media, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 04/11 2:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TERMINATING MOTION AS MOOT. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/26/2017 is continued to 8/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A Case Management Statement is due by 8/7/2017. The15 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference is terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Continue
Mon 04/10 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Multi Media, LLC.(Green, Ronald) (Filed on 4/10/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Service by Publication
Wed 04/05 12:28 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Multi Media, LLC.(Green, Ronald) (Filed on 4/5/2017) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - Screenshot of chaturbate.com, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2 - USPTO Reg. 4988208, | ||
Att: 3 5 pgs Exhibit 3 - USPTO Reg. 4288943, | ||
Att: 4 5 pgs Exhibit 4 - Alexa Ranking, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - WhoIs Record.to, | ||
Att: 6 7 pgs Exhibit 6 - Rothell Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 10 pgs Exhibit 7 - Randazza letter to Tonic, | ||
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit 8 - Email from Tonic, | ||
Att: 9 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/06 6:43 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to14 MOTION for Service by Publication . Responses due by 4/19/2017. Replies due by 4/26/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/08 11:06 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RONALD D. GREEN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon. S. Tigar granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/07 9:24 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11210008.) filed by Multi Media, LLC.(Green, Ronald) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Certificates of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 03/02 10:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/01 10:40 AM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/28 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by D. Gill Sperlein (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Tue 02/28 8:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/27 5:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Multi Media, LLC.. (Randazza, Marc) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 02/13 2:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2017. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Patent/Trademark Copy
Tue 01/24 7:17 PM
REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/24 7:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/20 2:20 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 01/20 1:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Multi Media, LLC (Randazza, Marc) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against chaturbate.to ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11090524.). Filed byMulti Media, LLC.(Randazza, Marc) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |