Judith Anne Moloney v. Leon Rodriguez, et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard Seeborg |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00303 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 2:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mark Hazuda
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeh Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leon Rodriguez
Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services 20 Massachusetts Ave, NW Room 5110
Washington, DC 20529 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Anne Moloney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 02/09 4:04 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING RE 15 MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 02/08 11:14 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Judith Anne Moloney.(Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 01/24 5:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to dismiss motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction as Moot. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 01/24 1:58 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re3 Ex Parte Application MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Stipulation to dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction as Moot filed by Mark Hazuda, Jeh Johnson, Leon Rodriguez. (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 01/23 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith Anne Moloney Case initiating documents and Order Setting Briefing schedule (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
11 | 11
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 01/23 4:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judith Anne Moloney re8 Summons Issued as to USA (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 01/23 3:09 PM
ORDER setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/23 2:16 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/23/17.(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 01/23 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Mark Hazuda, Jeh Johnson, Leon Rodriguez, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Mon 01/23 11:57 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 01/20 4:26 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/20 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Genna Ellis Beier (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/20 3:32 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Ex Parte Application Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 01/20 3:30 PM
Ex Parte Application , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Judith Anne Moloney.(Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration with attached exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Copy of the Complaint per L-R 65-1, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/20 3:04 PM
Proposed Summons. (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Fri 01/20 2:59 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11091388). Filed byJudith Anne Moloney.(Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration with exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |