16
|
|
16
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/18 10:11 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/18/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 04/17 9:58 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF MID AMERICA BANK & TRUST COMPANY; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Tara Amado. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 4/17/2017) Modified on 4/17/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/17 9:40 AM
PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT TOTAL CARD, INC. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1) by Tara Amado (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 4/17/2017) Modified on 4/17/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 03/22 1:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/29/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 11:39 AM
NOTICE by Tara Amado (of settlement with Mid America Bank & Trust Company) (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 03/15 3:01 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Response filed by Mid America Bank & Trust Company. (Lee, Gregory) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/24 2:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mid America Bank & Trust Company, Total Card, Inc.. Filed byTara Amado. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/21 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory K Lee (Lee, Gregory) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 02/13 3:50 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint and to Extend Time for Response filed by Mid America Bank & Trust Company. (Stewart, Ian) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/24 1:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Amado. Mid America Bank & Trust Company served on 1/24/2017, answer due 2/14/2017. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/23 4:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tara Amado.. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 01/23 11:04 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2017 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/20/17. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/20 3:25 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/20 1:01 PM
Proposed Summons. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Mid America Bank & Trust Company, Total Visa ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11090435.). Filed byTara Amado.(Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|