Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 2:17-bk-20023
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2017
Terminated:Sep 20, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Mar 29, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Forbes Energy International, LLC
Forbes Energy International, LLC 3000 South Business Highway 281
Alice, TX 78332
Represented By
Alan J. Kornfeld
Pachulski Stang Et Al.
contact info
Kenneth P. Green
Snow Spence Green LLP
contact info
Debtor
Forbes Energy Services Ltd., Forbes Energy Services Ltd.
Forbes Energy Services Ltd. 3000 South Business Highway 281
Alice, TX 78332
Represented By
Kenneth P. Green
Snow Spence Green LLP
contact info
Debtor
TX Energy Services, LLC
TX Energy Services, LLC 3000 South Business Highway 281
Alice, TX 78332
Represented By
Kenneth P. Green
Snow Spence Green LLP
contact info
Debtor
C.C. Forbes, LLC
C.C. Forbes, LLC 3000 South Business Highway 281
Alice, TX 78332
Represented By
Kenneth P. Green
Snow Spence Green LLP
contact info
Debtor
Forbes Energy Services Ltd.
Forbes Energy Services Ltd. 3000 South Business Highway 281
Alice, TX 78332
Represented By
Alan J. Kornfeld
Pachulski Stang Et Al.
contact info
Kenneth P. Green
Snow Spence Green LLP
contact info
Debtor
Forbes Energy Services LLC
3000 South Business Highway 281
Alice, TX 78834
Represented By
Alan J. Kornfeld
Pachulski Stang Et Al.
contact info
Kenneth P. Green
Snow Spence Green LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:05 PM CST
Attorney
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
Counter-Claimant
Jose Delagarza
Represented By
Jason F DeSouza
contact info
Creditor
Phoenix Investment Adviser LLC
The Graybar Building 420 Lexington Ave. Suite 2040
New York, NY 10170
Represented By
Christopher Donald Johnson
Mckool Smith P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Harrison County, Harrison CAD
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Lee Gordon
Mccreary Veselka Bragg & Allen, PC
contact info
Creditor
Houston CAD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Houston County
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott PO Box 2007
Tyler, TX 75710
Represented By
Tab Beall
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Jackson County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P.Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Lee County
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Live Oak CAD
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Lone Star HazMat Response, LLC
821 ESE Loop 323 Suite 530
Tyler, TX 75701
Represented By
Charles E Lauffer, Jr
Ritcheson, Lauffer, Vincent & Dukes, PC
contact info
Creditor
Davis McChristian
PO Box 630870
Nacogdoches, TX 75963
Represented By
William N Pedersen, Jr
Stripling, Pedersen & Floyd, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Orlando Mireles
Kittleman Thomas, PLLC 4900-B N. 10th Street
McAllen, TX 78504
Represented By
Michael A McGurk
Walsh Mcgurk Cordova Nixon, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Nacogdoches County Central Appraisal District
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott PO Box 2007
Tyler, TX 75710
Represented By
Tab Beall
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Nueces County
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Pacific Investment Management Company
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Christopher Donald Johnson
Mckool Smith P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Panola County
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott PO Box 2007
Tyler, TX 75710
Represented By
Tab Beall
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Jim Wells CAD
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Reagan county
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmnons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Creditor
Regions Bank
Represented By
Jason Lee Boland
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jose San Miguel
Kittleman Thomas, PLLC 4900-B N. 10th Street
McAllen, TX 78504
Represented By
Michael A McGurk
Walsh Mcgurk Cordova Nixon, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Solace Forbes Holdings, LLC
11111 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1275
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Represented By
Christopher Donald Johnson
Mckool Smith P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts and Texas Workforce Commission
Courtney J. Hull P.O. Box 12538
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Courtney Hull
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
United States of America
Represented By
Richard A. Kincheloe
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Victoria County
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Represented By
Bernard R. Given, II
Loeb & Loeb
contact info
Walter H Curchack
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Vadim J. Rubenstein
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ward County
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Groggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Webb CISD
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
West Face Capital, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Friedman
Chapman And Cutler LLP
contact info
John F Higgins, IV
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Creditor
Zapata County
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Zavala CAD
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Groggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Commonweatlh of Pennsylvania
Department of Labor and Industry c/o Amy Welkel/Collections Support Unit 651 Boas Street, Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121
Creditor
Ector CAD
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Groggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Franklin ISD
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Freer ISD
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Duval County
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dimmit County
3301 Northland Drive, Ste. 505
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
John T Banks
Perdue Brandon Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Tammie Delane
Represented By
Nathaniel Peter Holzer
Jordan Hyden Womble Culbreth & Holzer PC
contact info
Creditor
Reynaldo Davila
Anderson Lehrman Barre & Maraist LLP 1001 Third Street Suite 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Timothy P Dowling
Anderson Lehrman Barre & Maraist, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Courage capital Management, LLC
4400 Harding Road Suite 503
Nashville, TN 37205
Represented By
Christopher Donald Johnson
Mckool Smith P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Encana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Attention: Jarrod B. Martin 2800 Post Oak Boulevard 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Jarrod B. Martin
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Creditor
Atascosa County
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Groggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ascribe Capital LLC
299 Park Ave. 34th Floor
New York, NY 10171
Represented By
Christopher Donald Johnson
Mckool Smith P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Goliad County
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Goliad ISD
Represented By
Diane Wade Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Andrews Independent School District, et al
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott PO Box 817
Lubbock, TX 79408
Represented By
Laura J Monroe
Perdue Brandon Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Gregg County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Interested Party
Maria Felix Hernandez LeDezma
LUTTRELL + CARMODY LAW GROUP 100 NE Loop 410 Suite 615
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Leslie M. Luttrell
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group
contact info
Interested Party
Francisco Javier Gonzalez
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group 100 NE Loop 410 Suite 615
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Leslie M. Luttrell
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group
contact info
Interested Party
Arguindegui Oil Company II, Ltd.
745 E. Mulberry Suite 500
San Antonio, TX 78212
Represented By
Bethany Faith Thompson
Gardner Law
contact info
Interested Party
Carroll L Lee
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Jerry D Lee
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Felix Venegas, Jr.
550 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 530
Houston, TX 77027
Represented By
Graham E Sutliff
Sutliff Stout PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Sandra Cagle
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Sonia Chae United States Securities & Exchange Commission
Chicago Regional Office 175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
Sonia Anne Chae
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Interested Party
Larry G Lee
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Matthew Lee
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Peggy G Lee
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Lee Concho Valley Family, L.P.
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Miguel Garcia
Thomas J. Henry Injury Attorneys 521 Starr Street
Corpus Christi, TX 78401
Represented By
Janice Lindsey Corbin
Thomas J. Henry
contact info
Interested Party
Leeco Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Deborah Michell Perry
Munsch Hardt Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Josephine Garcia
Thomas J. Henry Injury Attorneys 521 Starr Street
Corpus Christi, TX 78401
Represented By
Janice Lindsey Corbin
Thomas J. Henry
contact info
Interested Party
Francisco Javier Gonzalez as Representative of the Estate of Hortencia Monroy-Hernandez, Deceased, and as Next Friend of KYG, a Minor
LUTTRELL + CARMODY LAW GROUP 100 NE Loop 410 Suite 615
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Leslie M. Luttrell
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group
contact info
Interested Party
Adan Monroy-Hernandez
LUTTRELL + CARMODY LAW GROUP 100 NE Loop 410 Suite 615
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Leslie M. Luttrell
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
606 N Carancahua
Corpus Christi, TX 78401
Represented By
Stephen Douglas Statham
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info


1. Forbes Energy eyes quick emergence from prepackaged Chapter 11 (reuters.com)
Submitted Tue 01/24/2017
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Saturday, September 23, 2017
274 274 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/23 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4157. Notice Date 09/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 273 Order on Motion for Final Decree
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
273 273 order Final Decree Thu 09/21 2:45 PM
Final Decree Closing the Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating Certain Noticing Services Related [+] Signed on 9/20/2017. (dsta)
Related: [-] 271
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 09/21 2:47 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (dsta)
Related: [-]