OOO Brunswick Rail Management et al v. Ostling
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Alfred V Covello |
Referred: | Robert A Richardson |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 24, 2017 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Paul Ostling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
OOO Brunswick Rail Management
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brunswick Rail Group, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
333 | 333
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 1:28 PM
ORDER finding as moot301 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
332 | 332
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 07/31 1:27 PM
ORDER finding as moot284 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
331 | 331
order
Order on Motion to Quash
Tue 07/31 1:25 PM
ORDER finding as moot283 motion to quash. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
330 | 330
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 07/31 1:15 PM
ORDER finding as moot282 motion for order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
329 | 329
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 07/31 1:09 PM
ORDER finding as moot281 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
328 | 328
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 07/31 1:08 PM
ORDER finding as moot280 motion for order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
327 | 327
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 12:59 PM
ORDER finding as moot279 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
326 | 326
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/31 12:58 PM
ORDER finding as moot278 motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
325 | 325
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 12:57 PM
ORDER finding as moot273 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
324 | 324
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
Tue 07/31 12:54 PM
ORDER finding as moot272 motion for issuance of letters rogatory. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
323 | 323
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 12:39 PM
ORDER finding as moot258 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
322 | 322
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 07/31 12:38 PM
ORDER finding as moot257 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
321 | 321
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 12:37 PM
ORDER finding as moot237 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
320 | 320
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 12:36 PM
ORDER finding as moot234 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
319 | 319
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 07/31 12:28 PM
ORDER finding as moot228 motion for order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
318 | 318
order
Order on Motion for Sanctions
Tue 07/31 12:23 PM
ORDER finding as moot203 motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
317 | 317
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/31 12:18 PM
ORDER finding as moot200 motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
316 | 316
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 12:17 PM
ORDER finding as moot195 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
315 | 315
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/31 12:16 PM
ORDER finding as moot194 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
314 | 314
order
Order on Motion to Show Cause
Tue 07/31 11:56 AM
ORDER finding as moot193 motion for order to show cause. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
313 | 313
order
Order on Motion for Sanctions
Tue 07/31 11:39 AM
ORDER finding as moot192 motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
312 | 312
order
Order
Tue 07/31 10:52 AM
ORDER. The notice of voluntary dismissal is noted and so ordered. The clerk is hereby directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Wed 08/08 9:24 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.) |
||
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
311 | 311
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice by Brunswick Rail Group, Ltd., Brunswick Rail Limited (Bermuda), OOO Brunswick Rail (Russia), OOO Brunswick Rail Management (Tu, Michael) |