Insomnia Cookies LLC v. Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC
Virginia Western District Court | |
Judge: | Glen E Conrad |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00005 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
1. | Insomnia Cookies files federal copyright lawsuit against Red-Eye Cookie Company (nydailynews.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/06/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST |
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Report on Filing Patent / Trademark
Mon 04/02 4:39 PM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk (jcj) |
|
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/29 10:43 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs incurred in connection with this action and STRIKING this action from the active docket of this court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/28/18. (jcj) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/22 2:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Insomnia Cookies LLC (Roberts, Wesley) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Mon 01/08 10:47 AM
Notice of Cancellation of all pretrial deadlines and Jury Trial for 3/12/2018 - Case stayed for 60 days while parties work out terms of settlement agreement. (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (ssm) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 01/08 10:45 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Stay (Cancelling the Jury Trial 3/12/2018, while parties work out terms of settlement). Signed by Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/8/2018. (ssm) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
motion
Stay
Thu 01/04 3:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Insomnia Cookies LLC. (Roberts, Wesley) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 10/23 1:10 PM
ORDER granting29 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct expert deadlines. Opening expert reports are now due December 8, 2017 and Responsive reports are now due January 12, 2018. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/23/17. (jcj) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 10/18 11:23 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct17 Scheduling Order, to Modify Expert Deadlines by Insomnia Cookies LLC.(Roberts, Wesley) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 09/18 3:14 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Modify Expert Deadlines. Opening expert reports due 10/27/17 and Responsive Reports are now due 12/1/2017. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/18/17. (hnw) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 09/12 12:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct17 Scheduling Order, to Modify Expert Deadlines by Insomnia Cookies LLC.(Roberts, Wesley) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/30 7:44 AM
STIPULATION Discovery Production Stipulation by Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC (Faraci, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 05/31 3:44 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Amend Expert deadlines as follows: Opening expert deadlines are now due 9/28/17 and Responsive reports are now due 10/27/17. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/31/17. (jcj) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Protective Order
Fri 05/26 4:03 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/26/17.(hnw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment B | ||
23 | 23
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 05/26 11:04 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct17 Scheduling Order, to Modify Expert Deadlines by Insomnia Cookies LLC.(Roberts, Wesley) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/25 2:51 PM
STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order by Insomnia Cookies LLC (Roberts, Wesley) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/23 1:45 PM
NOTICE by Insomnia Cookies LLC re20 Notice of Appearance Notice of Withdrawal of Richard C. Armstrong (Baugher, Andrew) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/22 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Baugher on behalf of Insomnia Cookies LLC (Baugher, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/18 4:59 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Entry (of Protective Order) by Insomnia Cookies LLC (Roberts, Wesley) Modified on 5/18/2017 (hnw) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 04/26 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 3/12/2018-3/16/2018 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before District Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ssm) |
|
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/26 8:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 1/31/2018 Jury Trial set for 3/12/2018 - 3/16/2018 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before District Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 04/26/2018. (ssm) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 04/20 5:08 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Roberts, Wesley) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Scheduling Letter
Wed 04/05 4:15 PM
Scheduling Letter (ssm) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 03/06 4:27 PM
Notice of Correction re13 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement; original document replaced with flattened pdf version. (mab) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/06 11:37 AM
Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC (Faraci, Stephen) (Main Document 13 replaced on 3/6/2017) (mab) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/06 10:27 AM
Notice of Filing Requirement to Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (mab) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties
Fri 03/03 12:50 PM
Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (mab) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/03 10:30 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC.(Faraci, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/28 2:47 PM
ORDER granting7 MOTION for Wesley A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wesley A. Roberts for Insomnia Cookies LLC added. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/28/17. (jcj) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/28 2:28 PM
ORDER granting6 MOTION for Scott P. Amy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/28/17. (jcj) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/27 3:37 PM
MOTION for Wesley A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Insomnia Cookies LLC.(Armstrong, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/27 3:31 PM
MOTION for Scott P. Amy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Insomnia Cookies LLC.(Armstrong, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 02/01 10:12 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Insomnia Cookies LLC. Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC waiver sent on 1/30/2017, answer due 3/31/2017.(Armstrong, Richard) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing Patent / Trademark
Mon 01/30 8:25 AM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk (jcj) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/26 12:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC.(jcj) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/26 11:55 AM
Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Insomnia Cookies LLC (Armstrong, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/26 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Red-Eye Cookie Company LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-2606799.), filed by Insomnia Cookies LLC. 70 Day Notice due by 4/6/2017 90 Day Service due by 4/26/2017(jcj) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D |