Hawaii District Court
Judge:J Michael Seabright
Referred: Rom Trader
Case #: 1:17-cv-00038
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2017
Terminated:Nov 21, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jul 24, 2017 11:25 PM HST
Defendant
Jody Buddemeyer
Represented By
Leslie R. Kop
Law Office Of Leslie R. Kop
contact info
Defendant
County of Hawaii Police Department, The
Represented By
Steven J.T. Chow
The Pacific Law Group
contact info
Laureen L. Martin
Office Of The Corporation Counsel-Hawaii
contact info
Kyleigh F. K. Nakasone
contact info
Defendant
County of Hawaii, The
Represented By
Steven J.T. Chow
The Pacific Law Group
contact info
Laureen L. Martin
Office Of The Corporation Counsel-Hawaii
contact info
Kyleigh F. K. Nakasone
contact info
Plaintiff
Elaine Surnow
Represented By
Matthew C. Winter
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Thomas M. Otake
Thomas M. Otake Aal, Alc
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Clare E. Connors
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Surnow
Represented By
Matthew C. Winter
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Thomas M. Otake
Thomas M. Otake Aal, Alc
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Clare E. Connors
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Max Surnow
Represented By
Matthew C. Winter
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Thomas M. Otake
Thomas M. Otake Aal, Alc
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Clare E. Connors
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Plaintiff
Sam Surnow
Represented By
Matthew C. Winter
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Thomas M. Otake
Thomas M. Otake Aal, Alc
contact info
Mark S. Davis
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Michael K. Livingston
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info
Clare E. Connors
Davis Levin Livingston Grande
contact info
Loretta A. Sheehan
Davis Levin Livingston
contact info

GPO May 14 2019
ORDER: (1) DENYING DEFENDANT BUDDEMEYER'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NO. 94, AND RELATED JOINDER, ECF NO. 165; (2) GRANTING DEFENDANT COUNTY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, ECF NO. 98; AND (3) GRANTING DEFENDANT COUNTY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, ECF NO. 99      "For the foregoing reasons, the court DENIES Buddemeyer's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, ECF No. 94, and the County's Simple Joinder, ECF No. 165; GRANTS the County's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Punitive Damages, ECF No. 98; and GRANTS the County's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding County Departments, ECF No. 99. The court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE: (1) all claims against the County of Hawaii Police Department as a separate entity; and (2) the claim against the County for punitive damages. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/14/2019 (jo)
GPO May 14 2019
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT COUNTY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING NOTICE REQUIREMENTS AND STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS, ECF NO. 96, AND DENYING DEFENDANT BUDDEMEYER'S SUBSTANTIVE JOINDER, ECF NO. 105      "For the foregoing reasons, the Countys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Notice Requirements and Statute of Limitations, ECF No. 96, is DENIED. Buddemeyers Substantive Joinder, ECF No. 105, is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/14/2019 (jo)
GPO Jul 17 2019
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NOS. 100, 102 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/17/2019. (jo)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM HST
Thursday, November 21, 2019
240 240 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thu 11/21 10:27 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES by County of Hawaii, The - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/21/2019. This action is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and LR41.1. There are no remaining parties and/or issues. (jo)
Related: [-]