TSI Holdings, LLC
North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | J Craig Whitley |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30132 |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 25, 2017 |
Debtor
TSI Holdings, LLC
4521 Sharon Rd Ste 450
Charlotte, NC 28211-4278 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
Michael D'Agata
14830 Resolves Lane
Charlotte, NC 28277 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Charlotte Dreibelbis
3600 Park Road H307
Charlotte, NC 28209 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Anthony William Packer
6505 Kilberry Lane
Charlotte, NC 28277 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Joseph W. Grier, III
Grier and Furr, P.A. 101 N. Tryon Street Suite 1240
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/31/2021 12:47 AM EST |
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/27 3:54 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Involuntary Petition 17-30132 [misc,invPet] ( 335.00). Receipt number 7539837, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
2
pgs
misc
Involuntary Petition (fee)
Fri 01/27 3:53 PM
Involuntary Petition Under Chapter 7 Filing Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by (Henderson, James) Modified on 1/30/2017 (jlb). SEE DEFECTIVE NOTICE2 . |