Allen v. Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Charles J Siragusa |
Referred: | Jonathan W Feldman |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-06059 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 27, 2017 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evelyn Allen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/01 2:38 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Schedule of Individual Payments(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 109 pgs Schedule of Individual Payments | ||
47 | 47
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/01 12:06 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release forms for Michelle Boehm, Brittany N. Cronan, Jermaine M. Evans | ||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/25 4:19 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Form(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Jason Overs Consent and Release Form | ||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/24 1:38 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms 1 through 100 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 7, 2018, | ||
Att: 2 Consent and Release Forms 101 through 200 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 7, 2018, | ||
Att: 3 Consent and Release Forms 201 through 299 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 7, 2018, | ||
Att: 4 Consent and Release Forms 1 through 100 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 14, 2018, | ||
Att: 5 Consent and Release Forms 101 through 200 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 14, 2018, | ||
Att: 6 Consent and Release Forms 201 through 300 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 14, 2018, | ||
Att: 7 Consent and Release Forms 301 through 400 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 14, 2018, | ||
Att: 8 Consent and Release Forms 401 through 478 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on September 14, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/24 11:21 AM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms 1 through 100 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on August 31, 2018, | ||
Att: 2 Consent and Release Forms 101 through 200 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on August 31, 2018, | ||
Att: 3 Consent and Release Forms 201 through 300 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on August 31, 2018, | ||
Att: 4 Consent and Release Forms 301 through 400 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on August 31, 2018, | ||
Att: 5 : Consent and Release Forms 401 through 500 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on August 31, 2018, | ||
Att: 6 Consent and Release Forms 501 through 511 provided to Plaintiffs Counsel on August 31, 2018 | ||
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/20 1:50 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms for Enmanuel Hernandez, Joye McClure, Phillip McNeil, Brandon Rhea, Melissa Vache | ||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/18 2:42 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms for Shantell C. Lewis, Tierra Moran, Gina Sapp, Justin M. Scharf, Misty B. Walker | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/18 12:56 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms 1 through 100 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 2 Consent and Release Forms 101 through 200 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 3 Consent and Release Forms 201 through 300 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 4 Consent and Release Forms 301 through 400 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 5 Consent and Release Forms 401 through 500 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 6 Consent and Release Forms 501 through 600 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 7 Consent and Release Forms 601 through 700 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 8 Consent and Release Forms 701 through 800 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 9 Consent and Release Forms 801 through 900 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 10 Consent and Release Forms 901 through 1001 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 11 Consent and Release Forms 1001 through 1100 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018, | ||
Att: 12 Consent and Release Forms 1101 through 1153 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 24, 2018 | ||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/17 2:03 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms for Frelissa J. Blake, Everett Dunn, William T. Graham, Tadd M. Hilyard, Saira Nogueras-Carrion, Becky D. Richard, Terrence Sidney, Ebony Stevents, Damesheka Williams | ||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/14 1:34 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms for Latisha L. Dunbar, Sean E. Ellis, Annette Gunn, Connie Island, James E. Marshall, Shannon J. Mauldin, Sergio A. Villarroel | ||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/11 2:19 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms for Nurah Abdul-Fattah, Pamela Foy, Paul Wigginton | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/11 2:13 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1001 through 1100 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 2 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1101 through 1200 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 3 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1201 through 1300 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 4 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1301 through 1400 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 5 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1401 through 1500 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 6 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1501 through 1600 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 7 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1601 through 1700 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 8 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1701 through 1800 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 9 Consent and Release forms Consent and Release Forms 1801 through 1851 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018 | ||
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/07 1:42 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms 501 through 600 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 2 Consent and Release Forms 601 through 700 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 3 Consent and Release Forms 701 through 800 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 4 Consent and Release Forms 801 through 850 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 5 Consent and Release Forms 851 through 900 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 6 Consent and Release Forms 901 through 1000 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018 | ||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/06 1:26 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms for Angel Holmes, Karl J. Kernaghan, Miles Merwin | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/06 12:33 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release Forms 1 through 100 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 9, 2018, | ||
Att: 2 Consent and Release Forms 101 through 106 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 9, 2018, | ||
Att: 3 Consent and Release Forms 1 through 100 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 4 Consent and Release Forms 101 through 200 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 5 Consent and Release Forms 201 through 300 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 6 Consent and Release Forms 301 through 400 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018, | ||
Att: 7 Consent and Release Forms 401 through 500 provided to Plaintiff's Counsel on August 17, 2018 | ||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/04 1:38 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release forms for Rebecca Brown, Avilla M. Casey, Myquanela Smith, Pearl Thompson, Carrie Van Scoy | ||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/29 2:05 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release forms for Tiara M. Broussard, Tara Bullock, Crystal Wells, Tierra Wroten | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/28 12:49 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release forms for Arinze L. Offor, Quincy Tran | ||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/24 2:11 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Consent and Release forms for Rebecca Thompson-Burris, Bria Davis, Heidy Sanchez, Kelli Young | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/22 1:01 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen Consent and Release Forms(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Filing Consent and Release Forms of Todd A. Bush, Vicki Christian, Mary Clemmey, Tysheka R. Cunningham, Carol Curcio, Stephanie Dougan, Camden Goodson, Darlisa Hall, Wynter Haynes, Lesley Hernandez, Shantel Hill, Victoria C. Jimenez, Juanita Johnson, Sandra J. Lennox, Nidhi Mehra, Katina Parker, Rachel Phelps, Dawn W. Scott, Rebecca Tolliver, Linda Ward, Sky R. Whisonant | ||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Settlement
Wed 05/30 3:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND APPROVING SETTLEMENT granting26 Motion for Leave to File; granting27 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 5/30/18. (KAP) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Settlement
Wed 05/16 4:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Evelyn Allen.(Christy, Chastity) |
|
Att: 1 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, | ||
Att: 2 Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Settlement of Lawsuit, | ||
Att: 4 General Settlement and Release Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order of Dismissal and Approving Settlement, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Anthony J. Lazzaro | ||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 05/07 12:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Settlement Agreement by Evelyn Allen.(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/09 5:22 PM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent Form(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Christine Maldonado Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Text Order
Wed 03/07 9:10 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of a letter from the parties indicating that a settlement has been reached in principle. As a result, the Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for 3/14/2018 11:00 AM is adjourned pending approval of the settlement by the Court. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/7/2018. (MAH) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/12 5:20 PM
TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2018 11:00 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/12/2018. (MAH) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/09 12:41 PM
ORDER the Rule 16 Conference is again adjourned and the parties are to provide a joint status report to the Court on or before 2/19/2018. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 1/9/2018. (MAH) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/07 10:50 AM
ORDER, the Rule 16 Conference is again adjourned and the parties are to provide a joint status report to the Court on or before 1/8/2018. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 12/7/2017. (MAH) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/10 8:37 AM
ORDER, the Rule 16 Conference is again adjourned and the parties are to provide a joint status report to the Court on or before December 5, 2017. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 10/6/2017. (MAH) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 08/08 1:21 PM
ORDER, parties to provide the Court with a joint status report no later than October 6, 2017. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 08/08/2017. (JKT) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Fri 06/09 3:55 PM
ORDER, the Rule 16 Conference is again adjourned and the parties are to provide a joint status report to the Court on or before August 7, 2017. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 06/08/2017. (JKT) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/27 9:26 AM
ORDER, at all parties' request, the Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2017 at 11:30 a.m. is adjourned. Counsel is directed to notify the Court to reschedule the conference should resolution not be possible, by way of joint status report, on or before June 7, 2017. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 04/27/2017. (JKT) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Text Order
Wed 04/05 11:45 AM
TEXT ORDER, at their request, plaintiff's counsel may appear telephonically for the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for May 3, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel is directed to dial the Court's chambers at (585) 613-4070. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 04/05/2017. (JKT) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/28 9:00 AM
ORDER, Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2017 11:30 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 03/28/2017. (JKT) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/27 3:15 PM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/27/17. (KJA) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/21 11:20 AM
NOTICE by Evelyn Allen of Filing Consent Form(Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Adeline DuVernay Consent Form | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 3:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sutherland Global Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sutherland Global Holdings, Inc. for Sutherland Global Services, Inc... (Moore, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/16 3:48 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by Sutherland Global Services, Inc..(Moore, Daniel) |
|
adr
ADR Plan
Fri 03/17 9:35 AM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 02/27 4:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lisa Demetsenaere on behalf of Sutherland Global Services, Inc. on 2/23/17, filed by Evelyn Allen. (Lazzaro, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 9:28 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/22/2017. (BK) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 9:26 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/22/2017. (BK) |
|
Saturday, February 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Sat 02/04 9:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin M. Cordello (Cordello, Justin) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/02 6:12 AM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-2710241.) by Evelyn Allen.(Cordello, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Justin Cordello with attachments, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/02 5:51 AM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-2710240.) by Evelyn Allen.(Cordello, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Justin Cordello with attachments, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 02/03 12:14 PM
Confirmed admission to the Ohio state bar for Attorney Anthony J. Lazzaro. (BK) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff
Wed 02/01 6:23 AM
CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Justin M. Cordello on behalf of Evelyn Allen.(Cordello, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Forms | ||
Sunday, January 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff
Sun 01/29 12:49 PM
CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Justin M. Cordello on behalf of Evelyn Allen.(Cordello, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Forms | ||
Saturday, January 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/30 1:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Sutherland Global Services, Inc.. (BK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 01/28 8:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Sutherland Global Services, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-2706749, filed by Evelyn Allen.(Cordello, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 01/30 1:50 PM
Hon. Charles J. Siragusa added. (BK) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/30 1:51 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Notice of Right to consent to a Magistrate Judge. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Mon 01/30 1:52 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK) |