Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 0:17-cv-60229
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2017
Terminated:Oct 16, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2017 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
The Cheesecake Factory, Inc.
Represented By
Linda M. Reck
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
John Luger McManus
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Paul Bernard Ranis
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. David S. Muransky
Represented By
Sean Martin Holas
Scott D. Owens, P.A.
contact info
Bret Leon Lusskin, Jr.
Bret Lusskin, P.A.
contact info
Scott David Owens
Scott D. Owens, P.A.
contact info
Keith James Keogh
Keogh Law, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
74 74 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 07/03 4:06 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying72 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/3/2018. (ean)
Related: [-]