Pan Pac International, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jacqueline P Cox |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-02550 |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Debtor
Pan Pac International, Inc.
3456 N Ridge #300
Arlington Heights, IL 60004 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ira Bodenstein
Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC Towbin LLC 321 N Clark Street Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60654 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 01/31/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Mon 01/30 12:03 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $335, Filed by Midong Michael Choi on behalf of Pan Pac International, Inc. (Choi, Midong Michael) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Mon 01/30 12:03 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/28/2017 at 01:30 PM at 219 South Dearborn, Office of the U.S. Trustee, 8th Floor, Room 800, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Choi, Midong Michael) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/30 12:07 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-02550 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33774497. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |