California Central District Court
Judge:Ronald Sw Lew
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:17-cv-00749
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2017
Terminated:Oct 02, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2017 3:28 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Unical Aviation, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory B Koltun
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Andrew C Stanley-Giles
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
China Cargo Airlines Ltd
Represented By
Leodis Clyde Matthews
Zhong Lun Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Unical Aviation, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory B Koltun
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Andrew C Stanley-Giles
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
China Cargo Airlines, Ltd.
Represented By
Dick P Sindicich, Jr
Zhong Lun Law Firm LLP
contact info
Leodis Clyde Matthews
Zhong Lun Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
85 85 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/02 4:21 PM
ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case83 . Upon consideration of said Stipulation and the record in this case, the relief requested by the Parties is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that: (1) This action is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice; (2) each Party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs for this action; and (3) the Court will retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing, if necessary, the settlement agreement between Unical Aviation, Inc. and China Cargo Airlines, Ltd., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
Related: [-]
84 84 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 10/02 9:12 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case83 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. The complete case numbere is 2:17-cv-00749-RSWL (JEMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
83 83 stip Dismiss Case Mon 10/01 2:06 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to based on settlement filed by defendant and counter-claimant Unical Aviation, Inc..(Koltun, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order