FULL CARE DENTAL PRACTICE, LLC
Montana Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Benjamin P Hursh |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-60061 |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Debtor
FULL CARE DENTAL PRACTICE, LLC
219 University Ave
Missoula, MT 59801-4351 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
CHRISTY L BRANDON
PO BOX 1544
BIGFORK, MT 59911 |
|
U.S. Trustee
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE
U.S. TRUSTEE'S OFFICE LIBERTY CENTER SUITE 204 301 CENTRAL AVE
GREAT FALLS, MT 59401 |
Docket last updated: 05/14/2017 10:30 AM MDT |
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
Judge RALPH B. KIRSCHER added to case, Trustee CHRISTY L BRANDON added to case. (Grady, Colleen) | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 01/31 9:07 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by FULL CARE DENTAL PRACTICE, LLC. All Schedules, Summary of Schedules & Statement of Financial Affairs Due 02/14/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/14/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 02/14/2017. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/2/2017. (MURPHY, EDWARD) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/31 9:08 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-60061 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 2211035. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/13/2017 at 01:00 PM at 341 MISSOULA;3720 N RESERVE ST;BITTERROOT RIVER RM;HILTON GARDEN INN;MISSOULA, MT 59808. (Grady, Colleen) | |
4 | 4 Deficiency Notice. (Grady, Colleen) |