Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee v. Otano
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-25477
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-25477
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-01043 |
Nature of Suit | 41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e) |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Beatriz Otano
13280 SW 68th St
Miami, FL 33183 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Mon 03/11 7:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by YV. Receipt Number 317883. (admin) |
||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/20 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1043 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/01 9:13 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee . (Miller, James) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/01 9:11 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee . (Miller, James) |
|
Sunday, July 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 07/31 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 07/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/31 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
court
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Fri 07/28 10:34 AM
Notice of Entry (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Fri 07/28 10:32 AM
Final Judgment Denying Bankruptcy Discharge. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff, Drew M. Dillworth Against Defendant, Beatriz Otano . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
16 | 16
order
Default Judgment [Order]
Fri 07/28 10:05 AM
Order Granting Verified Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Defendant Beatriz Otano . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/07 4:22 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee . (Miller, James) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Continue Hearing Order
Thu 04/06 8:22 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: (11 Unopposed First Motion to Reset Pretrial Conference And Trial On: [(1 Complaint)] ) (The Pretrial Conference in this matter will be reset if necessary after the Court Rules on the Verified Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant). (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/04 4:36 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee . (Miller, James) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Mon 04/03 6:11 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 01:31 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Continue Hearing
Mon 04/03 5:16 PM
Unopposed Motion to Reset Pretrial Conference And Trial On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee (Miller, James) Modified on 4/4/2017 To Add Verbiage. (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 04/03 10:09 AM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against Beatriz Otano Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee (Miller, James) |
|
Saturday, April 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 04/02 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 03/30 12:07 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Beatriz Otano (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default
Wed 03/29 1:05 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Beatriz Otano Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee (Miller, James) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Non-Mili | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 03/29 1:03 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Evidence of Receipt , Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee . (Miller, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 02/08 11:06 AM
Summons Service Executed on Beatriz Otano 2/7/2017 Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee, Defendant Beatriz Otano. (Miller, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Wed 02/01 12:30 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 02/01 12:29 PM
Summons Issued on Beatriz Otano Answer Due 3/3/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/12/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit
Tue 01/31 3:51 PM
Affidavit of James B Miller Non Military Affidavit Filed by Plaintiff Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee . (Miller, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/31 3:50 PM
Adversary case 17-01043 Complaint by Drew M Dillworth as Chapter 7 Trustee against Beatriz Otano. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Miller, James) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit To Defer Filing Fee |