Balik v. Chocolate Shoppe Ice Cream Company, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00455 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2017 3:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chocolate Shoppe Ice Cream Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
City of San Bernadino
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rodeway Inn San Bernadino
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeremiah W. Balik
1223 Wilshire Blvd. #777
Santa Monica, CA 90403 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/26 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for defendant Chocolate Shoppe Ice Cream Company, Inc. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 06/09 4:55 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable re36 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
Wed 05/24 3:40 PM
CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 05/24 3:24 PM
Mail returned. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 05/24 3:38 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to23 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremiah W. Balik (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 05/23 4:27 PM
Supreme Court of the United States Case Number 16-9022 (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
Thu 04/13 3:43 PM
CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 04/13 3:42 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremiah W. Balik (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/27 10:50 AM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Hon. William Alsup denying 29 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017) (dl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (3/27/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Jeremiah W. Balik.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
28 | 28
oth_sup
Exhibits
Fri 03/24 3:33 PM
Additional Evidence filed by Jeremiah W. Balik. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/22 4:48 PM
ORDER of USCA as to23 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremiah W. Balik (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Wed 03/22 3:32 PM
Letter from Jeremiah W. Balik dated 1/18/2017.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 03/20 11:25 AM
USCA Case Number 17-15479 9th Circuit for23 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremiah W. Balik. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Appeal Fee Payment Request
Thu 03/16 3:13 PM
Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017) |
|
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 03/16 2:31 PM
ORDER of USCA (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 03/16 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Jeremiah W. Balik. Appeal of Judgment21 , Order20 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Tue 02/28 8:15 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/28/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) (dl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (2/28/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 02/28 8:14 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/28/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) (dl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (2/28/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/23 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jolena Erene Grider AMENDED (Grider, Jolena) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/23 9:14 AM
NOTICE by City of San Bernadino OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS(Grider, Jolena) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 PETITION, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 DOCKET | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 02/23 9:08 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by City of San Bernadino (Grider, Jolena) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/23 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jolena Erene Grider (Grider, Jolena) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 02/16 3:44 PM
USCA Case Number 17-15280 Ninth Circuit for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremiah W. Balik. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order
Wed 02/15 8:53 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) (dl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (2/15/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 02/15 2:53 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration, IFP Status filed by Jeremiah W. Balik. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
12 | 12
oth_sup
Exhibits
Tue 02/14 2:42 PM
EXHIBITS re IFP Application filed byJeremiah W. Balik.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 02/14 2:38 PM
Letter re: IFP Status from Jeremiah Balik.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 02/14 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Jeremiah W. Balik. (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/07 10:55 AM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/7/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Mon 02/06 4:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/03 12:14 PM
ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the required $400 filing fee in full no later than February 17, 2017.(mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (2/3/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
oth_sup
Exhibits
Mon 02/06 12:32 PM
"Additional Evidence-Primer to U.S. Senate Kamala Harris" filed byJeremiah W. Balik. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/06 11:43 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeremiah W. Balik. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/01 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial by Jeremiah W. Balik (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/01 12:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeremiah W. Balik. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
2 | 2
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 02/01 12:31 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/01 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Chocolate Shoppe Ice Cream Company, Inc., City of San Bernadino, Rodeway Inn San Bernadino. Filed byJeremiah W. Balik. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2017.(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |