California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:17-cv-00512
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Mar 18, 2017 2:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Napa Vineyard House, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Slevin
Cobalt LLP
contact info
Vijay K. Toke
Cobalt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Vineyard House, LLC
Represented By
Katharine Heldt Falace
Buchalter, Apc
contact info
James Russell Rose
Buchalter, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Thursday, February 16, 2017
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Thu 1:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 4:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Vineyard House, LLC.. (Falace, Katharine) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 2:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Vineyard House, LLC Proof of Service of Summons (Falace, Katharine) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
6 6 misc Patent/Trademark Copy Wed 7:00 PM
REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 6:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Napa Vineyard House, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 6:48 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 12:12 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 11:40 AM
Proposed Summons. (Falace, Katharine) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Napa Vineyard House, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-11120873.). Filed by The Vineyard House, LLC.(Falace, Katharine) (Filed on 2/1/2017) Modified on 2/1/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet