Granite Home Enterprises, LLC
Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Susan D Barrett |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10155 |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Debtor
Granite Home Enterprises, LLC
2314 Getzen St
Augusta, GA 30906-3034 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
James C. Overstreet, Jr., Trustee
Klosinski Overstreet, LLP 1229 Augusta West Parkway
Augusta, GA 30909 |
|
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
Johnson Square Business Center 2 East Bryan Street, Ste 725
Savannah, GA 31401 |
Docket last updated: 02/02/2017 4:04 PM EST |
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 02/02 1:58 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-10155 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 14235699. Fee amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
32
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 02/02 1:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Granite Home Enterprises, LLC (Boudreaux, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)(AutoAssign)
Thu 02/02 2:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/08/2017 at 10:30 AM at Augusta Meetings - New. (admin, ) |