Carlino Enterprises, Inc
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Janet S Baer |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-03249 |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Carlino Enterprises, Inc
17054 Oak Park Ave.
Tinley Park, IL 60477 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
Michael Glenn, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Victory Campus, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Lorraine Lucivjansky Trust
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
MR Glenn Electric, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Integrity Sign Company
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
IKON Builders, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
JDM Consulting c/o Jeff Maciuelewicz
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 06/12 5:53 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (Roman, Felipe) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
Fri 06/09 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal . No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 06/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismiss
Tue 06/06 10:09 AM
(E)Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Debtor . Signed on 06/06/2017. (Watson, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Other Reasons
Tue 05/16 11:51 AM
Notice of Motion and Joint Motion to Dismiss Debtor Filed by Chester H Foster Jr. on behalf of Michael Glenn Sr., IKON Builders, LLC, Integrity Sign Company, JDM Consulting c/o Jeff Maciuelewicz, Lorraine Lucivjansky Trust, MR Glenn Electric, Inc., Victory Campus, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2017 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Foster, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling
Wed 03/08 7:34 AM
Order Scheduling . Discovery Cutoff 3/15/2017. Memorandum due by 5/24/2017. Response due by 4/5/2017. Status hearing to be held on 6/6/2017 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 3/7/2017 (Roman, Felipe) |
|
7 | 7
court
Hearing Continued (Status)
Tue 03/07 10:12 AM
(E)Hearing Continued. Status hearing to be held on 06/06/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 03/07/2017. (Watson, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Wed 03/01 10:45 AM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services . (Roman, Felipe) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Involuntary Answer
Tue 02/28 3:42 PM
Answer to Involuntary Petition Filed by Peter Hallam on behalf of Carlino Enterprises, Inc. (Hallam, Peter) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Involuntary Summons Service Executed
Thu 02/09 2:13 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Carlino Enterprises, Inc 2/7/2017, Answer Due 2/28/2017 Filed by Chester H Foster Jr. on behalf of Michael Glenn Sr.; IKON Builders, LLC ; Integrity Sign Company ; JDM Consulting c/o Jeff Maciuelewicz ; Lorraine Lucivjansky Trust ; MR Glenn Electric, Inc. ; Victory Campus, LLC. (Foster, Chester) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued in Involuntary Proceeding
Tue 02/07 12:56 PM
Involuntary Summons Issued on Carlino Enterprises, Inc . Status hearing to be held on 3/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (McGee, Kimberly) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 02/03 3:32 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-03249 [misc,invol11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33821749. Fee Amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 02/03 3:30 PM
Chapter 11 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Re: Carlino Enterprises, Inc Filed by Petitioning Creditors(s): Michael Glenn Sr. (attorney Chester H Foster Jr.), Victory Campus, LLC (attorney Chester H Foster Jr.), Lorraine Lucivjansky Trust (attorney Chester H Foster Jr.), MR Glenn Electric, Inc. (attorney Chester H Foster Jr.), Integrity Sign Company (attorney Chester H Foster Jr.), IKON Builders, LLC (attorney Chester H Foster Jr.), JDM Consulting c/o Jeff Maciuelewicz (attorney Chester H Foster Jr.) (Foster, Chester) |