State of Hawaii v. Trump
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Kevin Sc Chang |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00050 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 8th Amendment |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2017 11:08 PM HST |
Amicus
American Center for Law and Justice
345 Queen Street, Suite 701
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Muslim Health Professionals
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Anti-Defamation League
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund (AALDEF)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian Americans Advancing Justice (AAJC)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Asian Law Caucus)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Atlanta)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Chicago)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Asian Americans Advancing Justice (Los Angeles)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Sharon Brous
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Congregation B'nai Jeshurun
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Congregation Beit Simchat Torah
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
HIAS
1300 Spring Street, Suite 500
Silver Spring, MD 20910 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Reverend Curtis W. Hart
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jay Hirabayashi
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Hispanic National Bar Association (HNBA)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Human Rights First
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Hyde Park & Kenwood Interfaith Council
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
IKAR
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Ave., NW Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Interfaith Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
International Law Scholars
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Japanese American Citizens League, Honolulu Chapter (JACL Honolulu)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
KIND (Kids in Need of Defense)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Sharon Kleinbaum
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Karen Korematsu
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Noa Kushner
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Law Professors
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Joy Levitt
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Joel Mosbacher
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Imam Abdul Malik Mujahid
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Muppies
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Muppies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Muslim Advocates
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Asian Pacific American Bar Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Bar Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Council of Churches of Christ in the USA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Network of Arab-American Professionals
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
New York University
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi James Ponet
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Frederick Reeves
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi John Rosove
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
South Asian Bar Association of North America (SABA North America)
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Southern Poverty Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of California
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Iowa
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of New Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Michael Strassfeld
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
T.A.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tahirih Justice Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Technology Companies and Other Businesses
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The District of Columbia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Employment Law Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Muslim Public Affairs Council
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The National Arab American Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Right Reverend Allen K. Shin, Bishop Suffragan of the Episcopal
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Right Reverend Andrew Dietsche, Episcopal Bishop of New York
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Right Reverend Lawrence C. Provenzano, Episcopal Bishop of Long Island
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Right Reverend Marc Handley Andrus, Episcopal Bishop of California
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Right Reverend Mary D. Glasspool, Bishop Assistant of the Episcopal Diocese of New York
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Sikh Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Reverend Timothy Tutt
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Union Theological Seminary
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
United Methodist Women
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rabbi Peretz Wolf-Prusan
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Holly Yasui
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
City and County of Honolulu
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
City of Chicago
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
International Refugee Assistance Project
Urban Justice Center 40 Rector Street, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10006 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Victor Williams
(e-mail: americafirstlawyers@gmail.com) America First Lawyers Association 5209 Baltimore Ave.,
Bethesda, MD 20816 |
|
Defendant
John F. Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rex Tillerson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Hawaii
425 Queen Street
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ismail Elshikh
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Amicus
Lamar Christopher Chapman, III
Terminated: 03/29/2017
16900-424 FCI LORETTO FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 1000
LORETTO, PA 15940 |
|
Intervenor
Frederick Banks
Terminated: 03/14/2017
05711068 FMC BUTNER FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 1600
BUTNER, NC 27509 |
|
Intervenor
Ph.D. Vincent Lucas
Terminated: 03/14/2017
vlucaslegalaffairs@gmail.com P.O. Box 272
Amelia, OH 45102 |
|
Intervenor
Joseph Camp
Terminated: 03/22/2017
P01102062 on behalf of Mikki the Mime P. O. Box 16700
Golden, CO 80402 |
|
Intervenor
Eric Richard Eleson
Terminated: 03/21/2017
J59564 Mule Creek State Prison P. O. Box 409099
Ione, CA 95640 |
1. | Hawaii files lawsuit challenging Trump's new travel ban (cnn.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
416 | 416
![]() MANDATE of USCA as to391 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of State, Elaine Duke, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, USCA NO. 17-17168 The judgment of this Court, entered August 10, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 4l(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (emt, ) |