Barre et al v. Carter et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01057 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:504 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 05, 2017 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
Melina Mastoukas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WB Music Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael L Williams, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Party
|
|
Defendant
Sony Music Entertainment
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pretty Bird Pictures Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Parkwood Entertainment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Oakland 13 Music
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Asheton Hogan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eardrummers Music Publishing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eardrummers Entertainment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Beyonce Knowles Carter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Khalif Brown
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aspiro Ab
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Barre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel Barre
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Warner - Tammerlane Corporation
Terminated: 04/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Estate of late Youtube Star Messy Mya files $20M copyright infringement lawsuit against Beyonce (cbsnews.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/09/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
124 | 124
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Tue 02/06 12:07 PM
ORDER granting123 Motion to Dismiss Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/5/2018. (cms) |
|
123 | 123
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 02/05 12:58 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case by All Parties.(Etter, John) Modified text on 2/6/2018 to add joint filers. (clc). |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |