Franciscan Alliance, Inc., et al v. Norris Cochran, Acting Secy, et al
Original Case: 7:16-cv-00108
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-usc-10135 |
Type | united states civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 09, 2019 2:25 AM CST |
Movant - Appellant
RIVER CITY GENDER ALLIANCE
|
Represented By
|
Movant - Appellant
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF TEXAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, By and Through Governor Phil Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF WISCONSIN, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF TEXAS, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF NEBRASKA, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF LOUISIANA, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF KANSAS, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF ARIZONA, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF ARIZONA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF LOUISIANA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF KANSAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, By and Through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF NEBRASKA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF WISCONSIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
STATE OF TEXAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SPECIALTY PHYSICIANS OF ILLINOIS, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTIAN MEDICAL AND DENTAL SOCIETY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/09/2019 2:25 AM CST |
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Texas and River City Gender Alliance 17-10135 (NFD) |