Kemper v. United States Department of Vocational Rehabilitation
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00375 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 05, 2017 2:10 AM MST |
Defendant
United States Department of Vocational Rehabilitation
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Kemper
301 W Turney Ave., #28
Phoenix, AZ 85013 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/07 9:25 AM
MANDATE of USCA dismissing the appeal re: 17-15523 as to13 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Kemper. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit)(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Order, | ||
Att: 2 NDA | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 03/30 4:19 PM
ORDER, in the Court's view Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal is frivolous and is revoking Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status re: 17-15523 document15 . Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/30/17. (SLQ) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/29 3:06 PM
REFERRAL NOTICE of USCA: this matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith; if the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral; if the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal, re: 17-15523 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(20538584,'Kemper_v_United_States_Department_of_Vocational_Rehabilitation',13);">13 Notice of Appeal. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (REW) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 03/23 8:28 AM
USCA Case Number re:13 Notice of Appeal. Case number 17-15523 Ninth Circuit. (Copies sent by Ninth Circuit) (EJA) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 03/21 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:11 Order Dismissing Case by Kevin Kemper. (LAD) (4 pages. Plaintiff granted in forma pauperis by Order6 ) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/16 3:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Department of Vocational Rehabilitation filed by Kevin Kemper. (LAD) (4 pages, entitled "Appeal/Correction, Statement of Case") |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/09 4:21 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Doc.9 ) is dismissed without leave to amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/9/17. (LAD) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 03/01 4:17 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kevin Kemper. (DXD) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Memorandum
Wed 03/01 4:01 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law by Plaintiff Kevin Kemper. (DXD) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 02/15 3:09 PM
ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED directing Plaintiff familiarize himself with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules for the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/15/2017. (KFZ) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 02/15 3:06 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 5/8/2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/15/2017. (KFZ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/15 9:24 AM
ORDER granting5 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 02/15/2017. (ATD) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/14 10:49 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Short Form) by Kevin Kemper. (ATD) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/07 3:29 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying the Motion (Doc.2 ) without prejudice and directing Plaintiff to submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis or in the alternative pay the filing fee of $400.00 on or before February 21, 2017; if Plaintiff does not file a completed application or pays the $400.00 filing fee, this matter may be dismissed without prejudice and without further Order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this action on February 22, 2017, without further leave of the Court, should Plaintiff fail to comply with the Court's Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/07/2017. (REK) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 02/07 12:53 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00375 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/07 12:52 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kevin Kemper. (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/07 12:51 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Kemper.(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |