Doe #2 v. Haslam et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Eli J Richardson |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00264 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 07, 2017 4:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mark Gwyn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William E. Haslam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #2
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 10, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Costs Taxed
Thu 06/10 11:29 AM
Costs Taxed in amount of $1,499.20 against defendants. (dt) |
|
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Bill of Costs
Wed 05/05 8:56 PM
BILL OF COSTS by John Doe #2.(Adams, Walter) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A-Itemization of Costs, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment B-Supporting Declaration and Documentation | ||
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Entry of Judgment
Wed 04/28 9:11 AM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:31 Order. (dt) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/28 9:10 AM
ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the Court's previous memorandum opinion (DE# 115, in Lead Case 3 16-2862 ruling on the summary judgment motions and the memorandum opinion accompanying this Order, Plaintiffs' request for permanent injunctive relief is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for declaratory relief is also GRANTED. The Court previously resolved all other pending claims in its Order on the motions for summary judgment. 116. There are no further pending matters before this Court in this case. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute final judgment for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/5/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
30 | 30
8
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion of the Court
Wed 04/28 8:56 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/5/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 07/31 12:07 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/31/2020. (dt) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Substitute Attorney
Wed 07/29 5:19 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mark Gwyn, William E. Haslam. (Jones, Miranda) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 09/06 2:35 PM
ORDER: In light of the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 66 ) and Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. Nos. 73 , 79 ) pending in the Lead Case (Case No. 3:16-cv-2862), all pretrial deadlines, the pretrial conference set for November 4, 2019, and the bench trial set for November 12, 2019, are canceled, to be rescheduled, if appropriate, following the Court's ruling on the pending dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/6/2019. (mg) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Trial Management Order
Wed 03/06 9:20 AM
ORDER: Bench Trial set for 11/12/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Exhibit List due by 10/28/2019. Witness List due by 10/28/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2019. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/5/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 02/25 2:59 PM
ORDER: On February 22, 2019, three Motions for Summary Judgment and supporting documents were filed by Plaintiffs and Defendants (separately against John Doe and John Doe #2) in the Lead Case No. 3 16-2862 Docket Nos. 66-71 and 73-83. According to the Case Management Orders filed on December 28, 2017 (Docket No. 47) and on June 13, 2018 (Docket No. 58), the Response is due within 28 days of the filing of Motion, and any Reply shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the Response. Any filings made related the Motions for Summary Judgment (for extensions of time, exceed the page limits, seal documents, or make manual filings) shall be considered by the Honorable Eli J. Richardson, District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/25/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 10/22 11:59 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and Court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/18. (dt) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 03/07 9:48 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Dianna Baker Shew. (dt) |
||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/06 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dianna Baker Shew on behalf of Mark Gwyn, William E. Haslam (Shew, Dianna) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Trial Management Order
Tue 01/16 3:33 PM
ORDER: Bench Trial set for 7/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 6/24/2019. Witness List due by 6/24/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/16/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 01/09 2:23 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephanie A. Bergmeyer. (dt) |
||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/22 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Bergmeyer on behalf of All Defendants (Bergmeyer, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/20 11:48 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Linda D. Kirklen and Michael Alan Meyer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/20/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 10/12 11:39 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Brooke K. Schiferle. (dt) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/10 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke K. Schiferle on behalf of All Defendants (Schiferle, Brooke) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Substitute Attorney
Tue 10/10 11:22 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by all defendants. (Schiferle, Brooke) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Wed 03/15 4:28 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Consolidate for Purposes of Discovery and Pretrial Motions. Docket No. 14. The Motion seeks to consolidate the instant action with Case No. 3 16-2862 John Doe v. William E. Haslam, et al. for the purposes of case management, discovery, and pretrial motions only. The Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED. A copy of this Order and all future filings shall be made in the Lead Case, Case No. 3 16-2862 The Initial Case Management Conference set for April 10, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. The consolidated action shall remain on the docket in the Lead Case for the Initial Case Management Conference on March 29, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. before the undersigned. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/15/2017. (hb) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 03/14 2:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re1 Complaint filed by John Doe #2. (hb) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Tue 03/14 2:02 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/14/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 03/07 12:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by John Doe #2. (Adams, Walter) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Leave
Tue 03/07 8:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Proceed under Pseudonym re10 Response to Motion,3 MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re1 Complaint, by John Doe #2.(Adams, Walter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Proposed Reply Brief | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/01 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Meyer on behalf of All Defendants (Meyer, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 02/24 11:15 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Linda D. Kirklen. (hb) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/23 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Linda D. Kirklen on behalf of Mark Gwyn, William E. Haslam (Kirklen, Linda) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 02/22 4:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re1 Complaint, filed by Mark Gwyn, William E. Haslam. (Kirklen, Linda) |
|
9 | 9
order
Protective Order
Wed 02/22 3:44 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/22/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Tue 02/14 9:23 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/13/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Mon 02/13 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (hb) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 02/13 4:08 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward M. Yarbrough, J. Alex Little, Walter Justin Adams. (hb) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/10 9:07 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe #2. Mark Gwyn served on 2/9/2017.(Adams, Walter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Copy of Served Summons with AG stamp | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/10 9:06 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe #2. William E. Haslam served on 2/9/2017.(Adams, Walter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Copy of Served Summons with AG Stamp | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respoth
Brief (non-appeal)
Wed 02/08 3:44 PM
BRIEF filed by John Doe #2 re3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Adams, Walter) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/08 3:43 PM
MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re1 Complaint, by John Doe #2.(Adams, Walter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Proposed Protective Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 02/08 2:36 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (hb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/08 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Mark Gwyn, William E. Haslam (Filing fee PAID $400, Receipt number 0650-2377250), filed by John Doe #2. (Service copies fwd to Intake for pick up by counsel)(hb) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Summons |