Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Michael A Ponsor
Case #: 3:13-cv-30203
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2013
Terminated:Nov 07, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Dec 27, 2014 12:11 AM EST
Defendant
Town of Greenfield
Represented By
Carole Sakowski Lynch
Morrison Mahoney LLP
contact info
Mediator
Judge Kenneth P. Neiman
U.S. District Court-Springfield Office of the Clerk Federal Bldg. & Courthouse 1550 Main Street
Springfield, MA 01103
Plaintiff
Kelson Ting
Represented By
Tani E. Sapirstein
Sapirstein & Sapirstein, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
ADR Provider
Kenneth P. Neiman
Terminated: 11/07/2014
U.S. District Court-Springfield Office of the Clerk 300 State Street
Springfield, MA 01105


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/11 4:38 PM
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting35 Motion for Extension of Time. ALLOWED. Extension to March 22, 2015. (Lindsay, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 09, 2015
35 35 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/09 1:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/22/15 to order of dismissal by Kelson Ting.(Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 31, 2014
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 12/31 12:20 PM
Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting33 Motion for Extension of Time. (Calderon, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 24, 2014
33 33 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/24 11:21 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/05/2015 to reopen by Kelson Ting.(Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 07, 2014
32 32 Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. See attached order for complete details. (Calderon, Melissa)
Related: [-]
31 31 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Calderon, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 04, 2014
30 30 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: A Telephone Conference was held on 11/4/2014. There was significant progress. Counsel is to report to the Clerk by 11/7/2014 at 12:00 PM whether or not an agreement has been reached. (Court Reporter: None) (Calderon, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 29, 2014
29 29 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 10, 2014
27 27 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
Related: [-]
26 26 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting25 Motion for Protective Order, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 02, 2014
25 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Kelson Ting.(Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 29, 2014
24 24 Opposition re19 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash MOTION for Hearing filed by Town of Greenfield.(Lynch, Carole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, September 18, 2014
23 23 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Kenneth P. Neiman appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
22 22 Set/Reset Hearings: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for 10/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Incorrectly removed from calendar by docket entry 17 ) (Calderon, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
21 21 5 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash MOTION for Hearing filed by Kelson Ting.(Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
20 20 5 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kelson Ting. (Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
19 19 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash and MOTION for a Hearing by Kelson Ting.(Sapirstein, Tani). Added 2 additional reliefs MOTION to Quash, MOTION for Hearing on 9/15/2014 (Finn, Mary).
Related: [-]
18 18 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution to Magistrate Judge Neiman.(Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
17 17 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 9/15/2014 (Finn, Mary). ENTRY MADE IN INCORRECT CASE. Case still referred for ADR.
Related: [-]
16 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 10/29/2014 10:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
15 15 Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ORDER entered. Order with Respect to Mediation. (Calderon, Melissa)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2014
13 13 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2015 02:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2015 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor.(Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
12 12 Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall compl. their automatic discl. by 3/28/2014 Motions to amend the pleadings and/or add parties shall be filed by 5/9/2014. All non-expert disc. to be compl. by 10/28/2014. P's shall designate and discl. info. re: trial experts by 11/12/2014, D's due 12/10/2014. All expert depos. shall be compl. by 1/9/2015. D's motion for S/J due by 1/9/2015. P's opp. by 1/30/2015, D's reply by 2/6/2015. Motion hearing set for 2/19/2015 at 2:00 PM before Judge Michael A. Ponsor in the Hampden Courtroom. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2015 02:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2015 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2014
11 11 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
10 10 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D) . (Lynch, Carole)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2014
9 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING ISSUED, cc:cl. Scheduling Conference moved to 3/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint statement and LR 16.1 certs due by 3/10/14. (Healy, Bethaney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2014
8 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED, cc:cl. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2014 at 11:30 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint statement and LR 16.1 certs by 2/20/14. (Healy, Bethaney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2014
7 7 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman Referred for: Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). Further information: for a Rule 16 scheduling conf..(Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2014
6 6 ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Town of Greenfield.(Lynch, Carole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2014
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Sakowski Lynch on behalf of Town of Greenfield (Lynch, Carole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2014
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Greenfield served on 1/6/2014, answer due 1/27/2014. (Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2013
3 3 Summons Issued as to Town of Greenfield. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
2 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Michael A. Ponsor assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 12/3/2013 to add the consent form to the entry. (Finn, Mary).
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2013
1 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Greenfield Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4753037 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kelson Ting.(Sapirstein, Tani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet