WildEarth Guardians v. Colorado Springs Utilities Board
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Christine M Arguello |
Referred: | S Kato Crews |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00357 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 42:7604 - Clean Air Act -- Citizen Suit to Enforce Clean Air Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 08, 2017 3:02 AM MDT |
Defendant
Colorado Springs Utilities Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Colorado Springs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Colorado Springs Utilities
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WildEarth Guardians
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 08 2018
ORDER Denying Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/08/2018. (athom, ) |
1. | Lawsuit filed against Colorado Springs Utilities alleging over 3,000 Clean Air Act violations (gazette.com) |
Submitted Fri 02/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
66 | 66
order
Consent Decree
Thu 09/06 1:39 PM
CONSENT DECREE - GRANTING62 Joint Motion to Enter Consent Decree by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/6/2018. Status Conference set for 9/12/2018 is VACATED. (swest) |