Idaho District Court
Judge:Terry J Hatter, Jr
Case #: 1:17-cv-00063
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2017
Terminated:Apr 11, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 08, 2017 3:08 AM MDT
Defendant
Scott Talcott
Represented By
Melodie Annalise McQuade
Givens Pursley LLP
contact info
Michael O Roe
Givens Pursley LLP
contact info
Alexander P. McLaughlin
Givens Pursley LLP
contact info
Robert Blaine White
Givens Pursley
contact info
Plaintiff
AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC
Represented By
Brian C Wonderlich
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Kirk J Houston
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
A. Dean Bennett
Holland And Hart LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
35 35 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 08/31 3:29 PM
ORDER. It is ordered that Talcott's motion for attorneys' fees and costs be, and hereby is, DENIED . Signed by Judge Terry J Hatter, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/31 4:28 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian C Wonderlich terminated. Signed by Judge Terry J Hatter, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/04 5:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Scott Talcott.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/5/2022.(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
33 33 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/28 2:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re31 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant/Judgment Creditor Scott Talcott's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC. Replies due by 5/12/2022.(Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
32 32 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/08 1:43 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Brian Wonderlich only Request to Leave Noticing ON for this case by AttorneyA. Dean Bennett appearing for Plaintiff AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC. Responses due by 4/29/2022 (Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
31 31 motion Attorney Fees Thu 04/07 11:20 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Michael O Roe appearing for Defendant Scott Talcott. Responses due by 4/28/2022(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant/Judgment Creditor Scott Talcott's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Cost,
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael O. Roe,
Att: 3 Declaration of Lenden F. Webb,
Att: 4 Bill of Costs
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Tue 03/15 8:46 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Lenden F Webb for Scott Talcott Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
29 29 motion Pro Hac Vice Appearance Mon 03/14 1:23 PM
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Lenden F. Webb. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2361172.)Michael O Roe appearing for Defendant Scott Talcott. Responses due by 4/4/2022 (Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice Mon 03/14 2:47 PM
NOTICE TO COURT that counsel Kirk J. Houston wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Houston, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
28 28 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/11 3:38 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Stay or Dismiss Proceedings. It is Ordered that Defendants motion to dismiss be, and hereby is, Granted without prejudice. Signed by Judge Terry J Hatter, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
27 27 motion Expedite Fri 04/07 5:04 PM
MOTION to Expedite Decision on Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings [Dkt. 14] Michael O Roe appearing for Defendant Scott Talcott. Responses due by 4/28/2017(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/07 4:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Stay or Dismiss Proceedings filed by Scott Talcott.(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/07 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melodie Annalise McQuade on behalf of Scott Talcott (McQuade, Melodie)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/07 10:17 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply filed by Scott Talcott.(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 03/31 11:02 AM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Video Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2017 11:00 AM MT/10:00 AM PT in Video - Boise to First Street Courthouse in Los Angeles, CA (Mountain Time) before Judge Terry J Hatter Jr.. Video Motion Hearing to continue on 4/21/2017 if necessary. (so)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
22 22 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/24 5:44 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply and Non-Opposition to Filing of a Surreply filed by AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC. Replies due by 4/7/2017.(Wonderlich, Brian)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/24 4:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re14 MOTION to Stay or Dismiss Proceedings filed by AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC. Replies due by 4/7/2017.(Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A & B
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/24 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Wonderlich on behalf of AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC (Wonderlich, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
19 19 motion Strike Wed 03/22 7:01 PM
MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply Michael O Roe appearing for Defendant Scott Talcott. Responses due by 4/12/2017(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply
18 18 order Order Wed 03/22 11:16 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to United States District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. from the Central District of California, sitting be special designation, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (so)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Number Change Wed 03/22 12:41 PM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Terry J Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:17-cv-00063-TJH. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 03/13 2:54 PM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF VACATED HEARING: The Motion Hearing regarding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for March 16, 2017 at 3:30 is VACATED. (jlb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/09 6:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC.(Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Second Declaration of Eric Overman,
Att: 2 Second Declaration of Tim Zonneveld,
Att: 3 Second Declaration of Raymund D. Delos Santos,
Att: 4 Declaration of Thomas Evans
Friday, March 03, 2017
15 15 misc Stipulation Fri 03/03 4:57 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading by Scott Talcott. (Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stay Fri 03/03 4:14 PM
MOTION to Stay or Dismiss Proceedings Michael O Roe appearing for Defendant Scott Talcott. Responses due by 3/24/2017(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael O. Roe in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Thursday, March 02, 2017
13 13 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/02 5:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Scott Talcott. Replies due by 3/16/2017.(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Scott Talcott,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Talcott Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Talcott Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Talcott Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Talcott Declaration,
Att: 6 Declaration of Martin von Holly,
Att: 7 Declaration of Markus Huber
12 12 order Order on Motion to Expedite Thu 03/02 2:33 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Discovery and to Expedite a Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing is scheduled for 3/16/2017 at 3:30 p.m. in Boise, Idaho. Plaintiff shall file its reply brief on or before 3/9/2017. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/02 2:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's Reply due by 3/9/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2017 03:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Pursuant to Order Dkt.12 . (cjs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
11 11 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/28 4:53 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and to Expedite a Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Scott Talcott. Replies due by 3/14/2017.(Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Scott Talcott,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Talcott Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Talcott Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Talcott Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Talcott Declaration
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
10 10 motion Expedite Wed 02/22 5:26 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery and to Expedite a Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction A. Dean Bennett appearing for Plaintiff AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC. Responses due by 3/15/2017(Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Raymund D. Delos Santos,
Att: 3 Declaration of A. Dean Bennett
9 9 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Wed 02/22 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC, Scott Talcott re8 Notice of Appearance,6 Notice of Appearance,1 Complaint,7 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/24/2017. (cjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/17 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander P. McLaughlin on behalf of Scott Talcott (McLaughlin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/17 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Blaine White on behalf of Scott Talcott (White, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/17 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael O Roe on behalf of Scott Talcott (Roe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/15 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC. Scott Talcott served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/3/2017. (Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 02/10 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Scott Talcott. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 02/09 5:06 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction A. Dean Bennett appearing for Plaintiff AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC. Responses due by 3/2/2017(Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Tim Zonneveld,
Att: 3 Declaration of Eric Overman
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/09 5:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AP Service Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Associated Partners, L.P., Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC.. (Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/09 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Scott Talcott ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1547742.), filed by AP Wireless Infrastructure Partners, LLC.(Bennett, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons