Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:17-cv-20534
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:0001 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2017
Last checked: Monday Mar 27, 2017 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Bantel Telecom, LLC
3191 Grand Avenue Suite 1072
Miami, FL 33233
Represented By
Andrew J. Dominguez
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hispasat, S.A.
Represented By
Benjamin Henry Brodsky
Brodsky Fotiu-Wojtowicz, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
20 20 order Order Referring Case to Judge Tue 4:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and a report and recommendation on any dispositive matters.. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/25/2017. (pes)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
19 19 respm Response/Reply (Other) Fri 5:02 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY to1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration by Hispasat, S.A..(Brodsky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 03, 2017
18 18 respm Response/Reply (Other) Mon 4:58 PM
Defendant's RESPONSE to Petition by Bantel Telecom, LLC.(Dominguez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
17 17 utility Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge Mon 2:28 PM
Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2017-18 to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. (vjk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 2:27 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Defendant's motion for extension of time. Defendant must file an answer or otherwise respond to1 the petition on or before April 4, 2017. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/21/2017. (lky)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 5:27 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Petition by Bantel Telecom, LLC.(Dominguez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 06, 2017
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline Mon 3:03 PM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline per DE 14 Order: Bantel Telecom, LLC response due 3/21/2017. (tpl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 10:57 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant must file an answer or otherwise respond to the1 Petition on or before March 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/3/2017. (lky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 5:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Petition by Bantel Telecom, LLC. Responses due by 3/16/2017(Dominguez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew J. Dominguez on behalf of Bantel Telecom, LLC. Attorney Andrew J. Dominguez added to party Bantel Telecom, LLC(pty:dft). (Dominguez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
11 11 misc Declaration of Taking Wed 4:07 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF TERESA SANCHEZ GUITIAN (dj)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Declaration of Taking Wed 4:06 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF TERESA SANCHEZ GUITIAN (dj)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Conventional Filing Wed 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of8 Affidavit by Hispasat, S.A. (pes)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit Wed 9:30 AM
DECLARATION signed by : Benjamin H. Brodsky. by Hispasat, S.A. (pes)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Conventional Filing Wed 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of6 Declaration by Hispasat, S.A. (pes)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Wed 9:27 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION signed by : Teresa Sanchez Guitian. by Hispasat, S.A. (pes)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2017
5 5 misc Declaration of Taking Fri 11:55 AM
DECLARATION OF TAKING re1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration Declaration of Teresa Sanchez Guitan by Hispasat, S.A..(Brodsky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Lease Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Recognition of Debt Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh 3 - Award (Spanish),
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh 4 - Award (Translated)
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Bantel Telecom, LLC. (fbn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Fri 11:49 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (fbn)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Fri 11:49 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (fbn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel ARBITRATION Fri 11:41 AM
Petition (Complaint) to Enforce Arbitration. Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 113C-9476638, filed by Hispasat, S.A..(Brodsky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)