South Dakota District Court
Judge:Lawrence L Piersol
Case #: 4:17-cv-04014
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1332 - Diversity: Securities & Exchange Commiss
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2017
Terminated:Nov 06, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 09, 2017 4:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael Hurlburt
Represented By
Reece M. Almond
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith, LLP
contact info
Albert G. Lin
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Frankman
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith
contact info
Matthew L. Fornshell
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne Thompson
Represented By
Reece M. Almond
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith, LLP
contact info
Albert G. Lin
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Frankman
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith
contact info
Matthew L. Fornshell
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Rissing
Represented By
Reece M. Almond
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith, LLP
contact info
Albert G. Lin
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Frankman
Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith
contact info
Matthew L. Fornshell
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Newell
Represented By
Thomas C. Burman
Stinson Leonard Street LLP
contact info
Bryant Dale Tchida
Stinson Leonard Street LLP
contact info
W. Anders Folk
Stinson Leonard Street LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Johnson
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Kenny
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dan Kensinger
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Meis
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steve Meyer
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wade K. Jensen
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elisabeth Noel
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Powell
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tom Jacobson
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Sherman
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grant Shumaker
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Stokesbary
Represented By
Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Matthew Brian Kilby
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Peter C. Magnuson
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 22 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/22/18. (SLW)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
71 71 order Judgment Tue 11/06 4:22 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/6/18. (SLW)
Related: [-]