NCF CORPORATION
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | August B Landis |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10593 |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Debtor
NCF CORPORATION
6625 S Valley View Blvd Ste 310
Las Vegas, NV 89118-4557 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
LENARD E. SCHWARTZER
2850 S. JONES BLVD., #1
LAS VEGAS, NV 89146 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 7
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD, SO. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
Docket last updated: 02/11/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition 7
Fri 02/10 2:58 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335. Filed by SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ on behalf of NCF CORPORATION (SCHWARTZ, SAMUEL) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Fri 02/10 2:58 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ on behalf of NCF CORPORATION (SCHWARTZ, SAMUEL) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Fri 02/10 3:09 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition 7 17-10593 [misc,volp7pb] ( 335.00). Receipt number 17311781, fee amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)
Fri 02/10 11:00 PM
|