New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Referred: Paul E Davison
Case #: 7:17-cv-01046
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2017
Last checked: Friday Aug 11, 2017 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Sullivan
Represented By
Chelsea Ella Weisbord
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Steven Charles Stern
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Clarkstown
Represented By
John Martin Flannery
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Janine Agnes Mastellone
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Peter Alexander Meisels
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Defendant
Anthony J. Drescher
Represented By
John Martin Flannery
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Janine Agnes Mastellone
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Peter Alexander Meisels
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Maloney
Represented By
John Martin Flannery
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Janine Agnes Mastellone
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Peter Alexander Meisels
Wilson Elser,moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp(white Plains)
contact info
Defendant
Rodney T. Picott
Represented By
Kyle Charles McGovern
Lyons Mcgovern LLP
contact info
Desmond C.B. Lyons
Lyons Mcgovern, LLP
contact info
Diane Boenig Cavanaugh
Lyons Mcgovern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Police Officers John Does 1-10
Plaintiff
Elden Grenardo
Represented By
Stuart E. Jacobs
Jacobs & Hazan, LLP
contact info
David M. Hazan
Jacobs & Hazan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, September 22, 2017
40 40 1 pgs order Order Withdrawing Case from Mediation Fri 09/22 4:56 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on39 LETTER. ENDORSEMENT: The Court grants the parties' request to be removed from mediation. Status Conf. scheduled for Sept. 28, 2017 is cancelled. The parties are directed to confer and submit a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order to chambers by Sept. 28, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/22/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
39 39 misc Letter Tue 09/19 6:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kyle C. McGovern dated September 19, 2017 re: Request for Removal from Mediation Docket. Document filed by Rodney T. Picott.(McGovern, Kyle)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Letter Tue 09/19 3:28 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Janine Mastellone dated September 19, 2017 re: Request removal from the Court's mediation program. Document filed by Anthony J. Drescher, Daniel Maloney, Town of Clarkstown.(Mastellone, Janine)
Related: [-]
adr Mediator Session Not Held Tue 09/19 4:19 PM
MEDIATOR SESSION NOT HELD Mediator Session scheduled for 9/15/2017 at White Plains Courthouse was NOT held.(mf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/12 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chelsea Ella Weisbord on behalf of Michael Sullivan. (Weisbord, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2017
35 35 misc Letter Thu 07/06 4:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Janine A. Mastellone dated July 6, 2017 Document filed by Anthony J. Drescher, Daniel Maloney, Town of Clarkstown.(Mastellone, Janine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Unsealing Order
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
33 33 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/20 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/27/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 6/20/2017) (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
34 34 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/20 3:15 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/16/2017) (ama)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 06/20 2:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/16/2017. Plaintiffs and Defendants counsel present. The Court issued an Order of Reference to U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison for general pretrial purposes. This case is part of the § 1983 Pilot Program. Mediation is scheduled for September 15, 2017. Status conference before Judge Romn scheduled for September 28, 2018 at 12:00 pm. Parties are directed to submit proposed order and supporting case law as discussed at the conference. ( Status Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 218, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.). (gs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/31 3:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Sullivan.(Stern, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
adr Section 1983 Plan 100-Day Review Fri 05/26 10:03 AM
1983 PLAN 100-DAY REVIEW: The mediator shall be available to the parties throughout the discovery phase of the Plan and shall schedule and hold the first mediation session in the case within ten (10) days of the close of the discovery period. In the event that the mediation cannot begin within the time set forth herein, the assigned mediator shall promptly notify the Mediation Supervisor of the date by which the mediation will begin and the reason for the delay. The mediator shall correspond with the Mediation Office to arrange a mutually convenient date and time to hold the first session. 1983-Plan Review due by 9/5/2017. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/5/2017.(mf)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Selection for Mediation Fri 05/26 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR MEDIATION: This case has been selected for participation in the Southern District of New York's mediation program.(mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2017
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/25 3:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Rodney T. Picott.(Cavanaugh, Diane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 04/27 6:32 PM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File to Respond to the Complaint. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 27). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/27/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/27 2:21 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Steven C. Stern dated April 27, 2017. Document filed by Michael Sullivan.(Stern, Steven)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/27 6:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael Sullivan answer due 5/31/2017. (anc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/25 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Boenig Cavanaugh on behalf of Rodney T. Picott. (Cavanaugh, Diane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2017
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/25 9:58 AM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Picott granted an extension of time until May 31, 2017 to respond to the Complaint. The Initial Pre-trial Conf. adjourned from May 12, 2017 until June 16, 2017 at 12:00pm. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 18). So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/24/17) (yv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/25 10:05 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Rodney T. Picott answer due 5/31/2017., Set/Reset Hearings:(Initial Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/21 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Charles Stern on behalf of Michael Sullivan. (Stern, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/20 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Martin Flannery on behalf of Anthony J. Drescher, Daniel Maloney, Town of Clarkstown. (Flannery, John)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/20 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Alexander Meisels on behalf of Anthony J. Drescher, Daniel Maloney, Town of Clarkstown. (Meisels, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2017
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/19 6:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle Charles McGovern on behalf of Rodney T. Picott. (McGovern, Kyle)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/19 4:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Town of Clarkstown.(Mastellone, Janine)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/19 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janine Agnes Mastellone on behalf of Town of Clarkstown. (Mastellone, Janine)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/19 10:57 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Desmond CB Lyons dated April 19, 2017. Document filed by Rodney T. Picott.(Lyons, Desmond)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/19 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Desmond C.B. Lyons on behalf of Rodney T. Picott. (Lyons, Desmond)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 03/23 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/12/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 218, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. (mml)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Endorsed Letter Thu 03/23 12:42 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lino J. Sciarretta dated 3/20/2017 re: Counsel requests that the time for defendants, Chief Michael Sullivan and Police Officer Rodney T. Picott, to respond to the complaint be extended to April 20, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/22/2017) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/23 12:49 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Rodney T. Picott answer due 4/20/2017; Michael Sullivan answer due 4/20/2017. (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/20 10:40 AM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 13). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/17/17) (yv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/20 10:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthony J. Drescher answer due 4/20/2017; Daniel Maloney answer due 4/20/2017; Town of Clarkstown answer due 4/20/2017. (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/16 4:00 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Janine A. Mastellone dated March 16, 2017. Document filed by Anthony J. Drescher, Daniel Maloney, Town of Clarkstown.(Mastellone, Janine)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 5:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rodney T. Picott. (sj)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 5:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Maloney. (sj)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 5:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony J. Drescher. (sj)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 5:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Sullivan. (sj)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 5:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town of Clarkstown. (sj)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/13 6:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to POLICE OFFICER RODNEY T. PICOTT, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elden Grenardo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/13 6:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to POLICE OFFICER DANIEL MALONEY, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elden Grenardo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/13 6:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to POLICE OFFICER ANTHONY J. DRESCHER, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elden Grenardo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/13 6:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief of Police Michael Sullivan, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elden Grenardo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/13 6:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE TOWN OF CLARKSTOWN, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elden Grenardo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/13 6:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 02/13 4:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David M. Hazan to RE-FILE re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Mon 02/13 6:49 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Daniel Maloney added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elden Grenardo. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Elden Grenardo.(Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Mon 02/13 6:54 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Police Officers John Does 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elden Grenardo. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Elden Grenardo.(Jacobs, Stuart)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/14 5:01 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/14 5:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/14 5:02 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 12, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 02/12 11:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Anthony Drescher, Rodney Picott, Michael Sullivan, Town of Clarkstown. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13303799)Document filed by Elden Grenardo.(Hazan, David)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/13 1:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David M. Hazan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]