Southern Tracts, Inc.
Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Edward J Coleman III |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30047 |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2018 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | May 15, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Southern Tracts, Inc.
PO Box 582
Glenwood, GA 30428-0582 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
Johnson Square Business Center 2 East Bryan Street, Ste 725
Savannah, GA 31401 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 12:03 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 05/15 9:08 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (CMM) |