147
|
|
147
misc
Certificate Of Service
Mon 07/31 3:44 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Approving Final Application of Gerard A. McHale and McHale, P.A. for Allowance of Fees as Financial Advisor and Expert Witness for Debtor for the Period of May 20, 2017 through June 15, 2017 and Order Approving Final Application of Suplee, Shea, Cramer & Rocklein, P.A. for Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses as Certified Public Accountants for Debtor for the Period of April 1, 2017 Through June 23, 2017. Filed by Stephen R Leslie on behalf of Debtor Florida Ear & Sinus Center, P.A. Related [+]. (Leslie, Stephen)
|
| |
Att: 1
Mailing Matrix LBR 1007-2 mailing matrix
|
146
|
|
146
misc
Certificate Of Service
Fri 07/28 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Approving Final Application of Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A., for Allowance and Payment of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Attorneys for Debtor for the Period From May 1, 2017 through June 23, 2017. Filed by Stephen R Leslie on behalf of Debtor Florida Ear & Sinus Center, P.A. Related [+]. (Leslie, Stephen)
|
| |
Att: 1
Mailing Matrix LBR 1007-2 mailing matrix
|
145
|
|
145
order
Compensation
Fri 07/28 10:28 AM
Order Granting Application For Final Compensation Related [+]. Fees awarded to Suplee, Shea, Cramer & Rocklein, P.A. in the amount of $2043.00, expenses awarded: $29.25 Service Instructions: Stephen Leslie is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
|
144
|
|
144
order
Compensation
Fri 07/28 9:31 AM
Order Granting Application For Final Compensation Related [+]. Fees awarded to Gerard A McHale in the amount of $5219.00, expenses awarded: $43.60 Service Instructions: Stephen Leslie is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
|
143
|
|
143
order
Compensation
Thu 07/27 3:59 PM
Order Granting Application For Compensation Related [+]. Fees awarded to Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A. in the amount of $34427.00, expenses awarded: $109.28 Service Instructions: Stephen Leslie is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nita)
|
|
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 07/25 3:51 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Nita)
Related: [-]
|