South Carolina District Court
Judge:Margaret B Seymour
Referred: Mary Gordon Baker
Case #: 2:17-cv-00427
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2017
Terminated:Jun 07, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 09, 2017 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Trident Medical Center LLC
Represented By
Alissa D Fleming
Barnwell Whaley Patterson And Helms LLC
contact info
Morris Dawes Cooke, Jr
Barnwell Whaley Patterson And Helms LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Toni Renee Sarine
Represented By
A Christopher Potts
Hitchcock And Potts
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, June 07, 2018
33 33 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Thu 06/07 3:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 6/7/2018. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
31 31 adr ADR Statement/Certification Wed 05/02 6:15 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Trident Medical Center LLC(Strandberg, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
30 30 adr ADR Statement/Certification Wed 04/25 12:38 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Toni Renee Sarine(Potts, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Case Number Thu 04/12 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from 2:17-cv-00427-DCN-MGB to 2:17-cv-00427-MBS-MGB Sarine. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (ssam, )
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Case Reassigned CV Thu 04/12 9:17 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Margaret B Seymour. Judge David C Norton no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
27 27 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 01/08 10:57 AM
REFERENCE 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/8/2018.(ssam, )
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/08 10:56 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ABSENT EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES, NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Discovery due by 5/18/2018, Motions due by 7/5/2018, Mediation Due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/8/2018. (ssam, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2017
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Fri 12/29 3:07 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct17 Scheduling Order, by Trident Medical Center LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Cooke, Morris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
24 24 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order Tue 10/17 9:57 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 22 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Further details set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/17/2017.(ssam, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
22 22 motion Confidentiality Order Thu 10/12 10:50 AM
Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Trident Medical Center LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/26/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Cooke, Morris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order with REDLINED changes
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
20 20 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 10/11 10:06 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Clerk is directed to terminate Attorney Alissa D. Fleming as counsel of record for Defendant, and Attorney Anna L. Strandberg will be substituted as counsel of record for Defendant. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/11/2017. (arog,)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
19 19 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 10/10 1:54 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Trident Medical Center LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Strandberg, Anna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
18 18 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 09/05 2:18 PM
REFERENCE 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/5/2017.(ssam, )
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/05 2:17 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/6/2017, Discovery due by 1/3/2018, Motions due by 3/6/2018, Mediation Due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/5/2017. (ssam, )
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Tue 09/05 9:47 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct9 Scheduling Order,, by Toni Renee Sarine. Response to Motion due by 9/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Potts, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 11, 2017
15 15 order Order Fri 08/11 10:08 AM
TEXT ORDER re 14 Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance. The undersigned grants protection to Attorney Alissa D. Fleming for the following time periods: August 14, 2017 through August 18, 2017; September 18, 2017 through September 19, 2017; and November 3, 2017. This Order does not afford protection from any appearance required before the District Court Judge assigned to this case, although he may separately grant such protection. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 8/11/2017. (arog, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
14 14 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Tue 07/25 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Alissa D Fleming for Aug. 14, 2017 - Aug. 18, 2017; Sept. 18, 2017 - Sept. 19, 2017; Nov. 3, 2017 (Fleming, Alissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
13 13 2 pgs discov Rule 26(f) Report Mon 04/17 4:33 PM
Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Trident Medical Center LLC. (Cooke, Morris) Filing corrected for event type. (ssam, )
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 04/17 4:32 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trident Medical Center LLC.(Cooke, Morris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
11 11 9 pgs discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 04/13 3:42 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Toni Renee Sarine.(Potts, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
10 10 discov Rule 26(f) Report Fri 03/31 12:05 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Trident Medical Center LLC.(Fleming, Alissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/13 8:25 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/3/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/17/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 4/17/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/8/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/7/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/7/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/7/2017, Discovery due by 9/5/2017, Motions due by 11/6/2017, Mediation Due by 10/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 3/13/2017. (ssam, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 03/10 5:03 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trident Medical Center LLC.(Cooke, Morris)
Related: [-]
6 6 16 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/10 5:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Trident Medical Center LLC.(Cooke, Morris)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Fri 02/24 11:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toni Renee Sarine. Trident Medical Center LLC served on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017.(Potts, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Friday, February 10, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 02/13 1:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Trident Medical Center LLC. (ssam, )
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 02/13 1:34 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Toni Renee Sarine.(ssam, )
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/13 1:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Trident Medical Center LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-6994003), filed by Toni Renee Sarine. Service due by 5/11/2017(ssam, )
Related: [-]