Geraldo v. Insight Global Incorporated et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Orinda D Evans |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00509 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 09, 2017 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Insight Global, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SunTrust Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SunTrust Banks, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberta Geraldo
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Insight Global Incorporated
Terminated: 03/06/2017
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER GRANTING and APPROVING22 Motion for Settlement. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH FULL PREJUDICE with each party bearing her or its own costs pursuant to the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/7/17. (bnw) |
|
25 | 25
![]() ORDER GRANTING24 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/7/17. (bnw) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 06/07 4:23 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bnw) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re:23 Notice of Filing, Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release by Insight Global, LLC, SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc..(Newton, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
23 | 23
![]() PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release by Insight Global, LLC, SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. re22 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and for Entry of Dismissal with Prejudice (Newton, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
22 | 22
![]() Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and for Entry of Dismissal with Prejudice by Insight Global, LLC, SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc..(Newton, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER GRANTING20 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines to file a Joint Preliminary Planning Report and Discovery Plan and the Parties respective Initial Disclosures are hereby extended to and including May 30, 2017. Further, upon the Parties' filing of a joint motion for settlement approval, the deadlines to file the Joint Preliminary Planning Report and the Parties' respective Initial Disclosures shall be stayed until the Court rules on said joint motion for settlement approval. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/17/18. (bnw) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Planning Report and Discovery Plan and Initial Disclosures by Insight Global, LLC.(Newton, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER GRANTING18 Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and Initial Disclosures. JPRDP and Initial Disclosures due 5/10/17. Upon the Parties' filing of a joint motion for settlement approval The deadlines to file the Joint Preliminary Planning Report and the Parties' respective Initial Disclosures shall be stayed until the Court rules on said joint motion for settlement approval. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/21/17. (bnw) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Joint Preliminary Planning Report and Discovery Plan and Initial Disclosures by Roberta Geraldo. (Joiner, Blake) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Consent to Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. (Glanton, Tracy) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
![]() AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, (First Amended) by Insight Global, LLC. (Hall, Warren) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CDC Manager, Inc., Corporate Parent CB Finance, Inc., Corporate Parent CDC Ashford Landing, LLC, Corporate Parent CCW Spartanburg Leverage Fund III, LLC, Corporate Parent BGCV Valdosta Leverage Fund, LLC, Corporate Parent 7440 U.S. Highway 1 N., LLC, Corporate Parent BCCC Washington DC Investment Fund, LLC, Corporate Parent Bryson Creek Limited Partnership, Corporate Parent CDC Autumn, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Belton Woods, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Blackwell II, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Carver II, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Carver III, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Carver Redevelopment I, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Carver V, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Chatham Woods, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Commons at Ironbridge, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Country Garden, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Edgewood Seniors, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Friendly Heights, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Hays Mill Court, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC JOC Annex, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Kimberly II, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Kimberly III, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Magnolia Lake, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Medical Arts, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Mercury Court Apartments, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Oakley Square, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Olde Town GP, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Orchard Grove, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Peaks at West Atlanta, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Printer's Square, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Retreat at Dry Creek Farms, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Sassafras Senior, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Summerset Village, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Sustainable Fellwood, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Temple Court, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Triangle Partners, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Village Highlands, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Walton Legacy, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Walton Ridge, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Belton Woods, LP, Corporate Parent ARY Romeoville IL Landlord, LLC, Corporate Parent Bighorn River Trading, LLC, Corporate Parent Bronco Trading, LLC, Corporate Parent 2003 CDC Manager, LLC, Corporate Parent 2004 CDC Manager, LLC, Corporate Parent BBIF Orlando Investment Fund, LLC, Corporate Parent Blackwell Investment, II, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC Chamblee Senior Apartments, LLC, Corporate Parent CDC Country Garden, II, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CDC John O. Chiles Senior, L.L.C., Corporate Parent CW Nevada Landlord, LLC, Corporate Parent 2002 CDC Manager, LLC, Corporate Parent 109 N Main Street Units C6-9, Corporate Parent Atchison YMCA Investment Fund, LLC, Corporate Parent BMA Lynchburg VA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate Premium Assignment Corporation, Other Affiliate SunTrust Bank Holding Company, Other Affiliate GenSpring Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate GenSpring Family Offices, L.L.C., Other Affiliate SunTrust Capital I, Other Affiliate SunTrust Capital III, Other Affiliate SunTrust Delaware Trust Company, Other Affiliate SunTrust Plaza Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Equity Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust 1031 Exchange Co., Other Affiliate National Commerce Capital Trust I, Other Affiliate ST Management Services India Private Limited, Other Affiliate SunTrust Outsourcing Management, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Premium Assignment Corporation, II, Other Affiliate STB Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate STB Receivables (Central Florida), Inc., Other Affiliate STB Management Corporation, Other Affiliate STB FNC Corporation, Other Affiliate Transom Development, Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust International Banking Company, Other Affiliate STB Real Estate Parent (MA), Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust Real Estate Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate CM Finance, L.L.C., Other Affiliate SunTrust Leasing Corporation, Other Affiliate SunTrust Finance NC Corporation, Other Affiliate SunTrust Equipment Finance & Leasing Corp., Other Affiliate Twin Rivers Insurance Company, Other Affiliate SunTrust Student Loan Funding, L.L.C., Other Affiliate National Commerce Bank Services, Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust Banks, Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust Preferred Capital I, Other Affiliate SunTrust Community Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Personal Loans, Inc., Other Affiliate Twin Rivers II, Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate STCC Cannery Square Leverage Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate CRM Properties Manager, LLC, Other Affiliate CRM Central Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Bank, Other Affiliate ST CDE II LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE III LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE IV LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE V LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE VI LLC, Other Affiliate CRM Mid-Atlantic Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate STB Real Estate LLC, Other Affiliate Yellowstone Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate STB Real Estate Holdings (Commercial), Inc., Other Affiliate STB Holdings (Commercial) TRS, Inc., Other Affiliate STB Holdings (Household Lending) TRS, Inc., Other Affiliate STB Real Estate Holdings , Inc., Other Affiliate SJMCS Atlanta Leverage Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Student Loan Trust 2006-1, Other Affiliate SunTrust Securitization Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Total Return Swap Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Investment Services, Inc., Other Affiliate STB Holdings TRS, Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust NLIP, Inc., Other Affiliate STI Institutional & Government, Inc., Other Affiliate 155 Palencia Village Drive, LLC, Other Affiliate CDC Walton Ridenour, L.L.C., Other Affiliate CDC WDC I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate CHSD Durham Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate CIS Roanoke Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate East Lake Atlanta Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate HFHA Atlanta Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate JA Atlanta Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate KSP Atlanta Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate LD Crosby Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Olde Town Associates, L.P., Other Affiliate RS Graniteville Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate RT Amite LA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate RT Jackson MS Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate RT Port Richey FL Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate RT Villa Rica GA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate RTG CAHEC Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate RTG Dunn Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate SPRE Severn Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate SS Tallahassee Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XIV LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XIX, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XV, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XVI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XVII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XVIII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XX, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXIII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXIV, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXV LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Etowah Terrace, LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund I Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund II Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund III Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IV Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IV-LCI Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IV-LCI LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IX Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IX LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IX-GFB LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund V Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund VIII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund VI-LCI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund X LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XI Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XI LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XII Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XII LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XIII Limited Partner, LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XIII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Magnolia Lake LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Savannah Gardens III, LLC, Other Affiliate ST NC Fund I Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Braselton Court, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Brighton Pointe, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Brookcreek Crossing, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Crescent Landing, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Dry Creek Phase II, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC FTL I, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Hampton Village Apartments, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC HearthSide at PTC, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Heritage at Madison Pointe, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Lynnview Ridge, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Malibu Gardens Apartments, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC New Blossom, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Pauldoe Redevelopment Phase I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Poplar Pointe, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Richmond Overlook, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC RJFHOFI, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Savannah Gardens, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Stratford Court, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Tanglewood Heights, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Terraces at Park View, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Tower Road Gardens, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Town Center Heights, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Walden Pond II, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Walton Oaks Phase II, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Community Development Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA Atco Avenue NJ Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA Elizabethtown North PA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA Elizabethtown PA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA Lawnside NJ Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA Richwood NJ Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA Vineland NJ Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA White Horse Pike NJ Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate The MED Memphis Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate UC Knoxville Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate STEF NLIP, LLC, Other Affiliate Gallatin River Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate Gunnison River Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate Madison River Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate RT Arlington TX Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate RT Gulfport MS Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate Southland Associates, Inc. Durham, NC, Other Affiliate Spring Creek Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate STREIC TRS Inc., Other Affiliate Crosstown Memphis Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate GSWL Fort Meyers Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate MIA Union City Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Printer's Square Apartments Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate ST CDE LXXXI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XLI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXIX, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXX LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXIII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXIV, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXIX, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXVI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXVII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXXVIII, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Bluffs at Walnut Creek, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Hearthside Tucker, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Hudson Housing TCF XLI, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Legacy at Walton Oaks 2, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Legacy at Walton Oaks, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Manor at Broad Street, Other Affiliate STCC Mills Creek Crossing, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Savannah Gardens III, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Savannah Gardens IV, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Savannah Gardens V, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC School Street, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Step Fund I, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Sunrise Commons, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Walton Oaks Family, L.L.C., Other Affiliate ST GA FUND I LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund II LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund II - 2007 LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IV LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund V LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA FUND XIV Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA FUND XIV LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA SPECIAL MEMBER, LLC, Other Affiliate Upward Spartanburg Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Drew Atlanta Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE LXXXII, LLC, Other Affiliate Dean Rusk Atlanta Leverage LLC, Other Affiliate Families First Atlanta Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate GAI Atlanta Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate GC Las Cruces NM Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate GC Fort Wayne IN Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate LC LaGrange Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate LP Fort Mill SC Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate MB Walker LA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate MC Berwick PA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate MC Borger TX Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate MC Haleyville AL Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate MC Little Rock AR Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate Mercury Court Apartments, LP, Other Affiliate MIS Investment Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate My St. Albans VT Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate Peace River Lakeland Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Pigeon Forge Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate PPL Douglas Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Saferack Andrews Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Self-Help Investor XII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XIII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXVI, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXVII, LLC, Other Affiliate ST CDE XXVIII, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Aberdeen Chase, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Boston Financial TCF I, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Etowah Terrace, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC North Grove, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Pauldoe Redevelopment Phase II, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Pauldoe Redevelopment Phase III, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Pelican Cove Apartments, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC PNC Affordable Preservation Fund I, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC R4 Housing Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Stratford Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Suber Mill Heights, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC USB LIHTC FUND 2015, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Walters Ridge, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC West Bricknell View, LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund III LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XV LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Auto Receivables, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Auto Receivables Trust 2015-1, Other Affiliate THEARC DC Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate TPS Atlanta Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate LP Fort Mill SC Tract A-2 Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Banks Trust Company (Cayman) Ltd., Other Affiliate ST GA Fund X Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund VI-LCI Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund VIII Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund IX GFB Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate CDC Whitehall Apartments,LLC, Other Affiliate CDC Whtiehall Manor, LLC, Other Affiliate CRM Florida Properties,LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Brookline MA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Clarksville TN Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Columbia TN Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Crestview Hills KY Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Daly City CA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Decatur IL Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Glendale CA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Inglewood CA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Katy TX Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Mount Olive NC Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Philadelopia PA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Waynesburg PA, Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate DVA Winter Haven FL Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate GC Harlingen TX Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate Henry's Fork Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate LHANC Miami Investment Fund LLC, Other Affiliate Second Harvest Charlotte Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate SLH Clermont FL Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate SPS Amarillo TX Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate South Fork Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate St. CDE XXXV, LLC, Other Affiliate ST NC Fund I LLC, Other Affiliate STB Real Estate Holdlings (Household Lending), Inc., Other Affiliate STCC 15th Street Develoment Phase 1, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC-BTW Chapman II, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Cason Ridge, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Chase House, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Indian Creek, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC NEW AHF1, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Nothfield Ridge, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Orchid Estates, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Preserve at Hardwick, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC Riverside Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC RJFHOF6, LLC, Other Affiliate STCC Severna Park, L.L.C., Other Affiliate STCC White Circle Phase I, Other Affiliate ST GA Fund XVI Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA FUND XVI LLX, Other Affiliate ST GA Manor at Broad Street, L.L.C., Other Affiliate SunTrust Advisory Services,Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust CC Roseview Affordable Housing Preservation Investment LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Mortage, Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust Robinson Humphrey Funding, Inc., Other Affiliate SUSQUEHANNA Hazelton PA Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate TM Miami FL Landlord, LLC, Other Affiliate Two Rivers DC Investment Fund, LLC for SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.. (Hall, Warren) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc..(Hall, Warren) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Interested Persons by Insight Global, LLC. (Hall, Warren) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Insight Global, LLC. Discovery ends on 8/18/2017.(Hall, Warren) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., and SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. Answer is due 3/21/2017. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 3/7/17. (bnw) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc..(Glanton, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Mon 03/06 1:50 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Insight Global Incorporated only pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (bnw) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT Prejudice of Defendant Insight Global Incorporated filed by Roberta Geraldo (Joiner, Blake) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Return of Service Executed by Roberta Geraldo. SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. served on 2/14/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (LoRusso, Lawrence) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Return of Service Executed by Roberta Geraldo. SunTrust Banks, Inc. served on 2/14/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (LoRusso, Lawrence) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Return of Service Executed by Roberta Geraldo. SunTrust Bank served on 2/14/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (LoRusso, Lawrence) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Return of Service Executed by Roberta Geraldo. Insight Global, LLC served on 2/14/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (LoRusso, Lawrence) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Return of Service Executed by Roberta Geraldo. Insight Global Incorporated served on 2/14/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (LoRusso, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 02/13 2:30 PM
Submission of1 Complaint to District Judge Orinda D. Evans for review. (jkl) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Electronic Summons Issued as to Insight Global Incorporated, Insight Global, LLC, SunTrust Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.(jkl) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roberta Geraldo. (jkl) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Roberta Geraldo. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6967864.)(jkl) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |