Pedraza v. Kelley
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Referred: | Joe J Volpe |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00037 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Defendant
Wendy Kelley
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Pedraza
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
misc
Case File Note
Tue 09/20 5:09 PM
CASE FILE NOTE:14 Exhibit maintained as a material record and sent to the National Records Center (Accession 021 22-0302 Box 10 & 11). The remainder of the file is maintained as an electronic record. (ade) |
||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 08/23 11:52 AM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of 05/29/2018, as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza. (cmn) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 08/14 4:38 PM
ORDER of USCA as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza: The petition for rehearing by the panel is denied. (cmn) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Appeal Record Returned
Fri 07/06 10:42 AM
Appeal Record Returned: Respondent's Exhibit A, 9 Volume Direct-Appeal record, Pedraza v. State (Pedraza I), docket entry14 (mcz) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 06/21 10:17 AM
ORDER of USCA Recalling39 Mandate as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza. (mcz) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 06/21 10:16 AM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of 05/29/2018, as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza. (mcz) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
USCA Judgment
Thu 06/21 10:14 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza: The application for a certificate of appealability is denied. The appeal is dismissed. (mcz) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/08 4:17 PM
ORDER denying36 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Court declined to issue a certificate of appealability,26 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/8/2018. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Tue 02/06 10:42 AM
Letter from Clerk, USCA to Mr. Pedraza: The motion to appeal in forma pauperis which was mailed to the U.S. Court of Appeals is being forwarded to the District Court for ruling. (mcz) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/06 1:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, by Daniel Pedraza. (mcz) |
|
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 02/05 3:48 PM
ORDER of USCA as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza: Appellant has failed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the requisite docketing fees. Appellant is directed to show cause, within 14 days of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed. (mcz) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Fri 01/12 12:45 PM
Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re28 Notice of Appeal: Respondent's Exhibit A, 9 Volume Direct-Appeal record, Pedraza v. State (Pedraza I), 2014 Ark. 298,438 S.W.3d 226, docket entry14 . (mcz) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 01/09 3:40 PM
ORDER of USCA: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza. (mcz) |
|
31 | 31
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 01/09 3:37 PM
ORDER of USCA as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of this order. (mcz) |
|
30 | 30
appeal
USCA Docketing Letter
Tue 01/09 3:32 PM
USCA Docketing Letter as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza. USCA Case Number 18-1069 (mcz) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
Fri 01/05 3:37 PM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Pedraza re:26 Order and27 Judgment. (mcz) |
|
28 | 28
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 01/05 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL and Designation of Record as to26 Order and27 Judgment, by Daniel Pedraza. (mcz) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment
Mon 12/04 3:24 PM
JUDGMENT: Pedraza's petition is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/4/2017. (jak) |
|
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 12/04 3:16 PM
ORDER adopting20 Recommendation as supplemented and modified, and mostly overruling25 Objections. Pedraza's petition will be dismissed with prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/4/2017. (jak) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 10/30 3:54 PM
OBJECTION to20 Report and Recommendations by Daniel Pedraza. (kdr) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 10/10 2:38 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time. Pedraza's objections are due by 10/25/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/10/2017. (jak) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 10/10 2:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections and Statement of Necessity as to20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Daniel Pedraza. (kdr) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 09/12 1:12 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension. Pedraza's objections are due by 10/6/2017.21 Motion for appointed counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/2017. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend Time Appoint Counsel
Tue 09/05 1:08 PM
MOTION to Extend Time and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel Pedraza. (kdr) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 08/21 10:42 AM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Mr. Pedraza's § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed without prejudice2 . A certificate of appealability should not be issued. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/21/2017. (lej) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Reply (Non Motion)
Fri 08/18 11:17 AM
REPLY re12 Response to Habeas Petition, by Daniel Pedraza. (kdr) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 07/17 9:51 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Petitioner's motion to extend time 30 days to file a reply to the response to the petition17 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/17/2017. (lej) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extend Time
Fri 07/14 11:56 AM
MOTION to Extend Time by Daniel Pedraza. (ljb) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/08 11:17 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part and denying in part15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Response to Habeas Petition. Petitioner seeks sixty days to reply, and that request is excessive. Petitioner may have until 7/14/2017 to file a reply. Inasmuch as Petitioner's Motion seeks leave of the court to conduct discovery, that request is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/8/17. (Volpe, Joe) (Docket text modified on 6/8/2017 to remove duplicate text and punctuation, pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/08 11:08 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to12 Response to Habeas Petition by Daniel Pedraza. (mef) |
|
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 06/08 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 16 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text as follows: "ORDER granting in part and denying in part15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Response to Habeas Petition." (thd) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/19 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Conventional Filing of Respondent's Exhibit A: Nine-volume Direct-Appeal record, Pedraza v. State (Pedraza I), 2014 Ark. 298,438 S.W.3d 226 by Wendy Kelley re12 Response to Habeas Petition [Exhibit A maintained in the clerk's office filed] (jap) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Addendum
Fri 05/19 3:59 PM
INDEX of Exhibits filed by Wendy Kelley re12 Response (jap) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Fri 05/19 11:56 AM
RESPONSE to2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley.(Harris, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Document Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Briefs submitted in Pedraza I, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Courts opinion in Pedraza I., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - One-volume postconviction record, Pedraza v. State (Pedraza II), 2016 Ark. 85, 485 S.W.3d 686 (per curiam), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Briefs submitted in Pedraza II., | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Courts opinion in Pedraza II., | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of pretrial hearing transcript in Pedraza v.State, 2013 Ark. 116, 426 S.W.3d 441, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Excerpt of appellate record in (Victoria) Pedraza v. State, 2015Ark. App. 205, 465 S.W.3d 426. | ||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/05 8:20 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Respondent's motion to extend time to 5/19/2017 to file a response to the petition10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/5/2017. (lej) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 05/04 4:57 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley (Harris, Christian) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 03/28 2:52 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Respondent's motion to extend time to 5/5/2017 to file an answer to the petition8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/28/2017. (lej) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 03/28 12:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley (Harris, Christian) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Consent Notice
Fri 02/24 11:29 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/24 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Scholfield Harris on behalf of Wendy Kelley (Harris, Christian) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Directing Service (State Habeas)
Fri 02/17 12:20 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the Respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General by regular mail2 . Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other pleading responsive to the Petition within 40 days after service of this Petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/17/2017. (lej) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 02/17 10:48 AM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number LIT060564. (alm) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 8:32 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice Petitioner's Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees1 . If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he must within 30 days of the date of this order, either (1) pay the $5 statutory filing fee in full; or (2) show cause why he cannot pay the statutory filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/16/2017. (lej) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 02/13 2:59 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Pedraza. (ljb) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 02/13 1:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Pedraza. (ljb) |