South Carolina District Court
Judge:Margaret B Seymour
Case #: 2:17-cv-00440
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2017
Terminated:Mar 17, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Al Allen
Represented By
Stephen Harrison Williams
Wilkes Law Firm (chas)
contact info
Charles Daniel Atkinson
Wilkes Law Firm
contact info
Michael BT Wilkes
Wilkes Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Allen Aviation Inc
Represented By
Stephen Harrison Williams
Wilkes Law Firm (chas)
contact info
Charles Daniel Atkinson
Wilkes Law Firm
contact info
Michael BT Wilkes
Wilkes Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Dorchester County
Represented By
Marshall Andrew Earhart
Maybank Law Firm
contact info
Roy Pearce Maybank
Maybank Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Town Of Summerville
Represented By
Drew Hamilton Butler
Richardson Plowden And Robinson PA
contact info
John Horton Guerry
Richardson Plowden And Robinson PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Juanita Mae Stanley
Represented By
W Andrew Gowder, Jr
Pratt-Thomas Walker
contact info
Michael T Rose
contact info
Plaintiff
Mitch Randall Yawn
Represented By
W Andrew Gowder, Jr
Pratt-Thomas Walker
contact info
Michael T Rose
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 22, 2022
131 131 misc Document E-Mailed Mon 08/22 10:01 AM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED121 Memorandum,Opinion & Order, to cgraham@dorchestercounty.net at The Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Mon 08/22 10:02 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED121 Memorandum,Opinion & Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Dorchester County Court of Common Please, Cheryl L. Graham 5200 E Jim Bilton Blvd St George, SC 29477-8020 (hcor, )
Related: [-]