Wade v. JC USA, Inc.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00147 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 4:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
JC USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Wade
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Wed 10/25 12:03 PM
Order: Plaintiff has not repleaded his claims or amended his complaint in the time allotted, and pursuant to the Court's September 30, 2017 Order the dismissal in this case is converted to one with prejudice. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/25/2017) (skg) |
|
Saturday, September 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Sat 09/30 3:16 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/30/2017) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 09/01 1:41 PM
Designation of Experts by Cody Wade. (Jeter, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Jeter CV, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Love CV | ||
11 | 11
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 09/01 12:36 PM
Designation of Experts by JC USA, INC.. (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply
Mon 04/24 4:27 PM
REPLY filed by JC USA, INC. re:5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/14 9:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/13/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2017. Motions due by 12/29/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/1/2017. Discovery due by 12/1/2017. Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2018. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning on 4/30/2018 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/14/2017) (baa) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/13 10:10 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by JC USA, INC.. (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 04/10 10:51 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cody Wade re:5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Jeter, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Status Report Order
Wed 03/22 9:52 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER:Joint Report due by 4/19/2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/22/2017) (baa) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Mon 03/20 12:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by JC USA, INC. with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Vicki D Tall added to party JC USA, INC.(pty:dft) (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/15 1:35 PM
Summons Issued as to JC USA, INC. (wxc) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES)
Wed 02/15 1:29 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/14 5:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cody Wade. (Jeter, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against JC USA, INC. filed by Cody Wade. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8210426) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jeter, Justin) |