Johnson v. Oracle America, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard Seeborg |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00725 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Oracle America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcella Johnson
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against Oracle alleging company cut employees' sales commission rates (sfgate.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/15/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/24 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marcella Johnson (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 5/24/2017) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
adr
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held
Fri 05/12 12:38 PM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on 5/12/2017. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 7/24/2017, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 05/11 2:18 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference reset from 5/18/2017 to 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 05/11 11:49 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Marcella Johnson. (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 05/08 4:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/08 4:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to26 MOTION to Dismiss Notice, Motion, and MPAs . Motion Hearing previously set for 6/1/2017 continued to 6/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 05/05 2:40 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order filed by Marcella Johnson. (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 5/5/2017) Modified on 5/9/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 04/25 9:15 PM
Proposed Order re26 MOTION to Dismiss Notice, Motion, and MPAs by Oracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
30 | 30
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Tue 04/25 9:11 PM
Declaration of Stefan Boedeker in Support of26 MOTION to Dismiss Notice, Motion, and MPAs filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix 1 | ||
29 | 29
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Tue 04/25 9:09 PM
Declaration of Si Lutz in Support of26 MOTION to Dismiss Notice, Motion, and MPAs filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
28 | 28
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Tue 04/25 9:05 PM
Declaration of Margaret A. Daley in Support of26 MOTION to Dismiss Notice, Motion, and MPAs filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
27 | 27
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Tue 04/25 9:00 PM
Declaration of Brendan Dolan in Support of26 MOTION to Dismiss Notice, Motion, and MPAs filed byOracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/25 8:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Notice, Motion, and MPAs filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 5/9/2017. Replies due by 5/16/2017. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
25 | 25
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Tue 04/25 10:58 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Friday, May 12, 2017, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 04/24 7:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Marcella Johnson (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Mon 04/24 6:55 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Xinying Valerian (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/24 6:53 PM
NOTICE by Marcella Johnson of Firm Name Change (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
21 | 21
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Mon 04/24 4:38 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Sachs, Brittany) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
20 | 20
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Mon 04/24 4:13 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sachs, Brittany) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 04/24 10:49 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 04/07 5:16 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 4/7/2017) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 04/07 9:56 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Oracle America, Inc.'s Deadline to File Responsive Pleading filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/7/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Dolan of Counsel (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 4/6/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/21 10:54 AM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David W. Sanford. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/17 3:39 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David W. Sanford ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11242593.) filed by Marcella Johnson.(Sanford, David) (Filed on 3/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Statement
Thu 03/16 4:35 PM
Statement re12 Notice (Other) Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Oracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 3/16/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/02 10:25 AM
NOTICE by Marcella Johnson of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 03/01 11:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/28 5:02 PM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/28/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 02/27 12:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 02/27 11:52 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Oracle America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oracle Systems Corporation for Oracle America, Inc.. re7 Certificate of Interested Entities Defendant Oracle America, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 02/27 11:39 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Oracle America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oracle Systems Corporation for Oracle America, Inc.. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 02/27 11:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Service waived by Oracle America, Inc. waiver sent on 2/14/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/27 11:22 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oracle America, Inc... (Dolan, Brendan) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 02/24 2:14 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marcella Johnson.. (Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 02/15 8:29 AM
***ERRONEOUS ENTRY - PLEASE DISREGARD*** Mailed a copy of order 5 , Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction3 , and the petition and all attachments on Respondent. Mailed a copy of order 5 to petitioner's counsel. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 02/15 8:20 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 02/14 12:35 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 8:32 AM
COMPLAINT against Oracle America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11154505.). Filed byMarcella Johnson.(Valerian, Xinying) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |