Wood Builder, Inc.
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-80067 |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Debtor
Wood Builder, Inc.
48 Briarwood Ct
Greencastle, IN 46135-7660 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Lou Ann Marocco
PO Box 1206
Greenwood, IN 46142 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 02/16/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 02/15 4:37 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition 17-80067 JJG-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26888986. Fee amount 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
Wed 02/15 4:35 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Attorney Disclosure of Compensation and Verification of Creditor List filed by Robert C. Perry on behalf of Wood Builder, Inc. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 03/01/2017. Income & Expense Schedule due by 03/01/2017. (Perry, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 02/15 4:42 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 1007(a)(1) filed by Robert C. Perry on behalf of Debtor Wood Builder, Inc. (Perry, Robert) |