RBH Energy LLC v. The Dallas Morning News Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00432 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2017 4:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
The Dallas Morning News Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RBH Energy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Thu 07/13 10:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. All claims and counterclaims filed in this Lawsuit are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. All costs and attorneys' fees are taxed against the party incurring same. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/13/2017) (epm) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Thu 06/22 1:51 PM
Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (sss) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/22 1:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by RBH Energy LLC. (Janik, Glenn) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 06/22 1:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated per12 Stipulation of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (sss) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 8:23 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2017. Discovery due by 12/11/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2017. Motions due by 1/8/2018. Status Report due by 12/11/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/24/2017) (sss) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/14 10:54 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by RBH Energy LLC. (Janik, Glenn) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/22 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Dallas Morning News Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate A.H. Belo Corporation for The Dallas Morning News Inc. (Teicher, Shannon) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Mon 03/20 10:24 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Proposal Due by 4/17/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/20/2017) (aaa) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/10 3:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by The Dallas Morning News Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Shannon Zmud Teicher added to party The Dallas Morning News Inc(pty:dft) (Teicher, Shannon) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned
Thu 03/02 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The Dallas Morning News Inc ; served on 2/17/2017. (ndt) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Wed 02/15 12:30 PM
Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (sss) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/15 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to The Dallas Morning News Inc. (sss) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Fitzwater
Wed 02/15 12:16 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/15 12:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RBH Energy LLC. (Janik, Glenn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/15 12:05 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Dallas Morning News, Inc. filed by RBH Energy LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8211838) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Janik, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 Cover Sheet |