Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:17-cr-20026
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2017
Terminated:Nov 20, 2018
Last checked: Friday Dec 01, 2017 10:19 PM EST
Defendant
Jenny Nillo (8)
Represented By
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Ayana N. Harris
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Barbara E. Zas (4)
Represented By
Simon Toby Steckel
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Soto, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Jack Orlando Solano
Vilar & Solano PA
contact info
David Stuart Weinstein
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Hilliard Ennis Moldof
contact info
Defendant
Jaime Jesus Sola Avila (9)
Defendant
Hector Raul Santana (2)
Represented By
Lauren Fleischer Louis
Boies Schiller & Flexner
contact info
David Antonio Donet, Jr.
Donet, Mcmillan & Trontz, PA
contact info
Robyn Michelle Blake
Robyn M Blake PA
contact info
Defendant
Yipsy Rabelo Clavelo (15)
Represented By
Orlando do Campo
Do Campo & Thornton, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Camayd (18)
Represented By
David Adrian Howard
David A. Howard, PA
contact info
Defendant
Emily Marie Echavarria (11)
Represented By
Diego Weiner
Jeffrey S. Weiner, P.A.
contact info
Jeffrey Stuart Weiner
Jeffrey S. Weiner, P.A.
contact info
Annabelle Helene Nahra
Jeffrey S. Weiner, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Maria Rosa Diaz (5)
Represented By
Khurrum B. Wahid
Wahid Vizcaino LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nalina Sombuntham
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Dwayne Edward Williams
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cynthia Velasquez (17)
Terminated: 08/29/2017
Represented By
Michael James Rosen
Michael J. Rosen
contact info
Jose-Carlos A. Villanueva
Jose Carlos Villanueva, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Jorge Angel Sola (10)
Terminated: 05/30/2017
Represented By
Sheldon Lee Zipkin
Sheldon Zipkin
contact info
Defendant
Jose Salazar (16)
Terminated: 06/26/2017
Represented By
Nayib Hassan
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Mesa, Jr. (14)
Terminated: 07/31/2017
Represented By
Arnaldo Jesus Suri
Arnaldo J. Suri, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Yanet Huet (13)
Terminated: 10/30/2017
Represented By
Alian M Perez
Montesano & Perez, P.L.
contact info
Peter S. Heller
Peter S. Heller
contact info
Defendant
Michael Jose Gonzalez (7)
Terminated: 07/31/2017
Represented By
Valentin Rodriguez, Jr.
Law Offices Of Valentin Rodriguez P.A.
contact info
Adrian Peter Nunez
Criminal And Traffic Defense Group
contact info
Defendant
Herberto Elias Gamboa (6)
Terminated: 06/08/2017
Represented By
Jack Orlando Solano
Vilar & Solano PA
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Faraldo (3)
Terminated: 11/30/2017
Represented By
Simon Toby Steckel
contact info
Defendant
Eduardo Cruz Toledo (12)
Terminated: 06/27/2017
Represented By
Jeffrey Stuart Weiner
Jeffrey S. Weiner, P.A.
contact info
Annabelle Helene Nahra
Jeffrey S. Weiner, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/10/2020 3:30 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Miguel Soto, Jr, Hector Raul Santana, Miguel Faraldo, Barbara E. Zas, Maria Rosa Diaz, Herberto Elias Gamboa, Michael Jose Gonzalez, Jenny Nillo, Jaime Jesus Sola Avila, Jorge Angel Sola, Emily Marie Echavarria, Eduardo Cruz Toledo, Yanet Huet, Carlos Mesa, Jr, Yipsy Rabelo Clavelo, Jose Salazar, Cynthia Velasquez. Responses due by 1/31/2017 (ch1)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Miguel Soto Jr. (1), Hector Raul Santana (2), Miguel Faraldo (3), Barbara E. Zas (4), Maria Rosa Diaz (5), Herberto Elias Gamboa (6), Michael Jose Gonzalez (7), Jenny Nillo (8), Jaime Jesus Sola Avila (9), Jorge Angel Sola (10), Emily Marie Echavarria (11), Eduardo Cruz Toledo (12), Yanet Huet (13), Carlos Mesa Jr. (14), Yipsy Rabelo Clavelo (15), Jose Salazar (16), Cynthia Velasquez (17). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 1/17/2017. (ch1)
Related: [-]
3 3 37 pgs INDICTMENT as to Miguel Soto, Jr (1) count(s) 1, 2-17, Hector Raul Santana (2) count(s) 1, 2, 10-11, 14, Miguel Faraldo (3) count(s) 1, 2, 9-12, 16, Barbara E. Zas (4) count(s) 1, 2, 9, 11-12, Maria Rosa Diaz (5) count(s) 1, 2, 9-12, 16, Herberto Elias Gamboa (6) count(s) 1, 17, Michael Jose Gonzalez (7) count(s) 1, 17, Jenny Nillo (8) count(s) 1, 3-8, 13-15, Jaime Jesus Sola Avila (9) count(s) 1, 6, Jorge Angel Sola (10) count(s) 1, 3-8, Emily Marie Echavarria (11) count(s) 1, 7, 14-15, Eduardo Cruz Toledo (12) count(s) 1, 8, Yanet Huet (13) count(s) 1, 13, Carlos Mesa, Jr (14) count(s) 1, 3, Yipsy Rabelo Clavelo (15) count(s) 1, 8, Jose Salazar (16) count(s) 1, 7, Cynthia Velasquez (17) count(s) 1, 4-5. (ch1) (ch1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/18/2017) Restricted Unredacted Indictment