Florida Construction Inc.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Raymond B Ray |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-11900 |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Debtor
Florida Construction Inc.
3500 NE 12th Ave
Oakland Park, FL 33334-4524 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Kenneth A Welt
1776 N. Pine Island Rd #101
Plantation, FL 33322 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 02/17/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 02/16 3:55 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-11900 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29263602. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Thu 02/16 3:53 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Hagen, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Thu 02/16 3:53 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 03/23/2017 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 411, Fort Lauderdale. Proofs of Claim due by 06/21/2017. (Hagen, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Thu 02/16 3:53 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Kevin L Hagen Esq. (Hagen, Kevin) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 02/16 3:53 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Florida Construction Inc.. (Hagen, Kevin) |