LOPEZ v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jose L Linares |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01073 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/29 5:32 PM
ORDER that the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is hereby AFFIRMED; that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this matter CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/28/2017. (ld, ) |
|
17 | 17
12
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 11/29 5:31 PM
OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/28/2017. (ld, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 11/29 5:34 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, ) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Brief
Thu 11/02 1:53 PM
BRIEF Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1(VON SCHEVEN, ANNE) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Brief
Tue 09/19 12:26 PM
BRIEF ABRAHAM S. ALTER (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Fri 08/18 12:19 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's request for an additional 30 days within which to file its moving brief. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/18/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Thu 08/17 4:55 PM
Letter from ABRAHAM S. ALTER EXTENSION. (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Wed 07/12 9:40 AM
Letter from Commissioner Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1. (VON SCHEVEN, ANNE) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 06/13 2:26 PM
Letter from ABRAHAM S. ALTER 9.1. (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 06/01 10:08 AM
ORDER pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1(d)(1) that the plaintiff will serve and electronically file a statement of the primary contentions or arguments for relief by JUNE 15, 2017; that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1 (d)(2) that the SSA will serve and electronically file a response stating whether it agrees that the plaintiff is entitled to relief by JULY 14, 2017, that the SSA, if failing to abide by the above directive, will be deemed to disagree that the plaintiff is entitled to relief; that pursuant to Local Civil Rules 9.1(e)(1) and 9.1(e)(5) that the plaintiff will serve and electronically file a brief by AUGUST 14, 2017,;etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/31/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Administrative Record - SSA
Tue 05/30 8:54 AM
Administrative Record Filed - Social Security.(VON SCHEVEN, ANNE) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Part 5, | ||
Att: 5 Part 6, | ||
Att: 6 Part 7, | ||
Att: 7 Part 8, | ||
Att: 8 Part 9 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE VON SCHEVEN on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (VON SCHEVEN, ANNE) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/02 9:46 AM
USM SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCES R LOPEZ. U.S ATTORNEY GENERAL served via Certified Mail. (ld, ) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 04/12 5:04 PM
USM SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRANCES R LOPEZ. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 3/28/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 1:06 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Donato Marucci* (dam) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Tue 03/14 10:46 AM
CERTIFICATE of USMS, USM 285 Forms Returned (ld, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter: re USM 285
Wed 03/01 11:20 AM
CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (ld, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Wed 03/01 11:14 AM
ORDER granting In Forma Pauperis and directing the Clerk to file the Complaint; that the Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons, and theUnited States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and summons upon Defendant. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/28/2017. (ld, ) |
|
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/01 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT see document1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Filing and Admin fee $ IFP Granted), filed by FRANCES R LOPEZ.(ld, ) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Tue 02/21 4:28 PM
Complaint Received.(byl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Application IFP, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |