In Re Disciplinary Action Andrew U D Straw
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon E Deguilio |
Case #: | 1:17-mc-00005 |
Nature of Suit | 999 Civil - Miscellaneous |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/23 2:21 PM
ORDER STRIKING43 MOTION for Compensation Based on 57 Months of Suspension by In Re Andrew U D Straw. The clerk is DIRECTED to return this document to Andrew U.D. Straw unfiled as required by the Seventh Circuit. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/23/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed in Order)(lhc) |
|
Tuesday, November 16, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/16 4:57 PM
MOTION for Compensation Based on 57 Months of Suspension by In Re Andrew U D Straw. (rmc) |
|
Att: 1 proposed order | ||
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 11/16 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address per43 by Andrew U D Straw from 241A Brittany Dr Streamwood, IL 60107 to 700 12th St NW Ste. 700 PMB 92403 Washington, DC 20005. Resent41 to new address. (rmc) |
||
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 05/20 10:15 AM
Mail Returned from Andrew U D Straw as Undeliverable -41 ORDER denying40 Verified Motion to Vacate Discipline. Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward/for review **C042**.(edb) |
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/12 11:09 AM
ORDER denying40 Verified Motion to Vacate Discipline. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 04/12/2021. (Copy mailed to 241A Brittany Drive, Streamwood, IL 60107)(rk) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/18 2:53 PM
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio. Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to the case. (jss) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/18 2:55 PM
VERIFIED MOTION to Vacate Discipline by In Re Andrew U D Straw. (jss) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Letter
Thu 01/02 9:32 AM
Letter via email from Andrew Straw. (rs) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Letter
Mon 12/30 1:43 PM
Letter via email from Andrew Straw (rs) |
|
Att: 1 certification | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Mon 12/30 1:33 PM
Letter via email from Andrew Straw (rs) |
|
Att: 1 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Certification | ||
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/26 2:25 PM
ORDER: The Court STRIKES the Respondent's latest filing34 Motion to Rescind My Law License in This District and Close This Case. The November 13, 2018 Motion will remain a part of the record in this closed case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 11/26/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/13 4:31 PM
MOTION to Rescind My Law License in this District and Close this Case by Andrew U D Straw. (lns) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 10/03 1:57 PM
MANDATE of USCA (certified) as to26 Notice of Appeal filed by Andrew U D Straw. The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (lhc) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 09/27 11:28 AM
ORDER of USCA as to26 Notice of Appeal filed by Andrew U D Straw. IT IS ORDERED that the MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD WITH APPELLANT'S AFFIDAVIT REGARDING THE INDIANA DISCIPLINE, filed on September 23, 2018, by pro se Respondent-Appellant is DENIED. (lhc) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/31 9:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING28 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Appeal by Andrew U D Straw and WAIVING the appellate filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/31/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party and USCA)(lhc) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 05/31 8:37 AM
USCA Case Number 18-2192 for26 Notice of Appeal filed by Andrew U D Straw. (lhc) |
|
29 | 29
appeal
Short Record Sent to USCA
Wed 05/30 9:02 AM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re26 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. Motion for IFP pending. (mlc) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/29 4:44 PM
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Appeal by Andrew U D Straw. (ksc) |
|
27 | 27
appeal
Docketing Statement
Tue 05/29 4:42 PM
Docketing Statement re:26 Notice of Appeal filed by Andrew U D Straw. (ksc) |
|
26 | 26
appeal
Notice of Appeal - court user
Tue 05/29 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to25 Order by Andrew U D Straw. (ksc) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/11 9:43 AM
ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to STRIKE the Respondent's Motion24 , but to leave it as part of the record. Any future filings that are not a motion for reinstatement will be automatically stricken. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/10/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/04 1:44 PM
MOTION to take Judicial Notice by In Re Andrew U D Straw. (sct) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/03 2:51 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Order, the Petitioner's Motions18 ,19 ,20 ,21 , &22 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/3/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/27 11:01 AM
MOTION For Abolition of My Law License in the Northern District of Indiana by In Re Andrew U D Straw. (sct) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/03 3:08 PM
MOTION for Relief filed by In Re Andrew U D Straw. (sct) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/25 4:28 PM
VERIFIED MOTION for Dismissal of Suspension by In Re Andrew U D Straw.(mtr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/20 3:55 PM
MOTION For Compensation Under Fifth Amendment Takings Clause by In Re Andrew U D Straw.(mtr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 09/22 9:06 AM
VERIFIED MOTION for Fifth Amendment Takings Compensation by In Re Andrew U D Straw. (mtr) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order Imposing Disciplinary Action
Wed 09/06 3:45 PM
ORDER regarding attorney Andrew U D Straw. Respondents Motion DE#8 is DENIED. The Respondent is reminded that reinstatement shall be governed by the provisions of Local Rule 83-6.11. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/6/17. (cc Andrew U D Straw, 1900 E Golf Rd Ste 950A, Schaumburg, IL 60173.)(mtr) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Wed 08/16 2:56 PM
Letter and envelope from Andrew U D Straw (mtr) |
|
Saturday, August 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Wed 08/09 11:31 AM
Letter via email from Andrew U D Straw (mtr) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Wed 08/09 11:30 AM
Letter via email from Andrew U D Straw (mtr) (mtr) |
|
Att: 1 (8/9/2017) Supplement Request for Investigation | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 08/04 8:16 AM
Letter via email from Andrew U D Straw. (mtr) |
|
Att: 1 INSD Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Complaint Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Complaint Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Complaint Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Complaint Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Complaint Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Complaint Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Complaint Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Complaint Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Complaint Exhibit 10 | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Fri 08/04 7:55 AM
Letter via email from Andrew U D Straw. (mtr) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Thu 08/03 10:17 AM
Letter via email from Andrew U D Straw (mtr) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Letter to Senators, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement VA State Bar Letter and Order | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Wed 08/02 10:34 AM
Letter via email from Andrew U D Straw. (mtr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit VA State Bar Letter and Order | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Wed 08/02 10:30 AM
Letter via email from Andrew U D Straw. (mtr) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Vacate
Wed 07/26 9:15 AM
Verified MOTION to Vacate4 Order Imposing Disciplinary Action, by In Re Andrew U D Straw.(mtr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Envelope | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Striking Document ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 06/05 12:47 PM
ORDER STRIKING Respondent's Motion (ECF No.6 ), but it is to remain a part of the record in this matter. The Respondent is reminded that reinstatement shall be governed by the provisions of Local Rule 83-6.11. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/5/17. (cc Andrew U D Straw)(mtr) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Reinstate Disciplined Attorney
Fri 05/26 3:09 PM
MOTION to Reinstate Disciplined Attorney; filing fee of $47 DUE ***NO FEE PAID***FEE DUE In Re Andrew U D Straw.(mtr) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement VSB Letter & Order, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Fri 03/24 2:17 PM
Letter via Email from Andrew U D Straw (mtr) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/24/2017) (mtr). Modified (to correct Date Filed)on 3/24/2017 (mtr) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Order | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Imposing Disciplinary Action
Tue 03/21 12:50 PM
ORDER IMPOSING DISCIPLINARY ACTION regarding attorney Andrew U.D. Straw. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-6.8(c), Respondent Andrew U.D. Straw is hereby suspended from the practice of law before the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana. Reinstatement shall be governed by the provisions of Local Rule 83-6.11. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/21/17. (cc Andrew U D Straw, 1900 E Golf Rd Ste 950A, Schaumburg, IL 60173.) |
|
Saturday, March 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement
Sat 03/11 4:26 AM
STATEMENT in opposition to discipline, with reasons given, regarding2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline,,.(Straw, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - First Proposal for Law Reform to Increase Disability Rights, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Second Proposal for Law Reform to Increase Disability Rights, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Third Proposal for Law Reform to Increase Disability Rights, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Memorandum on Disability Reforms Recommended to Indiana Supreme Court | ||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline
Mon 03/06 2:23 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re1 Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline, in attorney disciplinary matter regarding attorney Andrew U.D. Straw. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-6.8(b), the Court gives respondent 30 days after service of this Order within which to show cause why the imposition of reciprocal discipline by this Court would be unwarranted. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 03/06/2017. (cc Andrew U D Straw, 1900 E Golf Rd Ste 950A, Schaumburg, IL 60173.)(mtr) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
order
Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline
Fri 02/17 4:27 PM
ORDER dated 02/14/2017 from Indiana Supreme Court imposing the following discipline regarding Andrew U D Straw: Respondent is suspended from the practice of law in this state for a period of not less than 180 days, without automatic reinstatement, effective immediately. Signed by Loretta H Rush, Chief Justice of Indiana. (mtr) |